Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd. v. Bonobos, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.
Defendant: Bonobos, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Global Value Commerce, Inc., TGUSA, Inc., The Golf Warehouse, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Lyst Ltd and Lyst Ltd a United Kingdom limited company doing business as List Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01226
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Andrew D Hallman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 19 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Bonobos, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2021. Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
October 7, 2021 Filing 18 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Walmart, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2021. Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
October 7, 2021 Filing 17 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by TGUSA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2021. Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
October 7, 2021 Filing 16 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Nordstrom, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2021. Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
September 29, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman to Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (dsg)
August 19, 2021 Filing 14 Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
August 19, 2021 Filing 13 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (sss)
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/17/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/18/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 1/18/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (sss)
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8197386 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VAu 503-611--KS-6716--Hiroshi Terakawa, VAu 720-699--HPI-25945--Hawaiiprint, Inc., VAu 1-002-675--Tropical Birds--Hawaiiprint, Inc.. Filed by Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16). (DuBoff, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd. v. Bonobos, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trendtex Fabrics, Ltd.
Represented By: Edward T. Fu
Represented By: Leonard D. DuBoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonobos, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Value Commerce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TGUSA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Golf Warehouse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyst Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyst Ltd a United Kingdom limited company doing business as List Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?