Dunn et al v. Moll et al
Plaintiff: Jack Dunn and Rose Henley
Defendant: Edith Moll, Sherry Hall, Does 1-10 and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2021cv01396
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Andrew D Hallman
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Association of Counsel Filed by Edith Moll. (Johnson, Katie)
November 9, 2021 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice Motion to Dismiss #17 . Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O) (Tom, Meagan)
November 9, 2021 Filing 17 Motion to Dismiss . Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Tom, Meagan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service upon Edith Moll served on 9/23/2021. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (kgc)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Meagan S Tom (ECF No. #14 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/25/2021.) (dsg)
October 21, 2021 Filing 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Meagan S Tom. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8278401. Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Tom, Meagan)
October 21, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Meagan S Tom. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8278401 #14 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
October 13, 2021 Filing 13 Declaration of Shawn A. Lillegren. Filed by Sherry Hall. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 .) (Lillegren, Shawn)
October 13, 2021 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by Sherry Hall. (Lillegren, Shawn)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss Advice Notice regarding Motion to Dismiss #6 . Response is due by 11/15/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/12/2021.) (dsg)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF No. #7 ). Answer is due by 11/10/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/12/2021.) (dsg)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 Supplemental Certificate of Service by U.S. Bank National Association of Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 , Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 #7 Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Applegate, Brett)
October 11, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Applegate, Brett)
October 11, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Applegate, Brett)
October 11, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Motion to Dismiss Insufficiency of Service. Filed by Edith Moll. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of David Nepom) (Nepom, David)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case was recently transferred to Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. At that time the case was inadvertently transferred to the Pendleton Division. The case has been updated to the Portland Division. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman.(Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/12/2021.) (dsg)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo to Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman and transferred to the Pendleton Division. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/30/2021.) (sss)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/20/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/22/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 2/22/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 09/22/2021.) (kgc)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued at Intake at the time of filing as to Sherry Hall, Edith Moll, U.S. Bank National Association. (kgc)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Receipt No. 95007. Summons issued as to Edith Moll, Sherry Hall, and U.S. Bank National Association. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jack Dunn, Rose Henley against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (kgc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn et al v. Moll et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Henley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith Moll
Represented By: Katie Jo Johnson
Represented By: David R. Nepom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Hall
Represented By: Stephen Lewis Madkour
Represented By: Shawn A. Lillegren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Meagan S Tom
Represented By: Brett E. Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?