Oregon Nurses Association v. Providence Health & Services Oregon
Plaintiff: Oregon Nurses Association
Defendant: Providence Health & Services Oregon
Case Number: 3:2021cv01570
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting Defendants' Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss in Part Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint to Compel Arbitration #10 on the under advisement calendar of 1/24/2022. (gm)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 Declaration of Ed Choi. Filed by Providence Health & Services Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #10 .) (Choi, Edward)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Filed by Providence Health & Services Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Choi, Edward)
December 7, 2021 Filing 9 First Amended Complaint to Compel Arbitration. Filed by Oregon Nurses Association against Providence Health & Services Oregon. (Olney, Margaret)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #6 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 12/8/2021 for Defendant Providence Health & Services Oregon. (gm)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Providence Health & Services Oregon. (Choi, Edward)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Providence Health & Services Oregon. (Choi, Edward)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Edward Choi appearing on behalf of Providence Health & Services Oregon. Filed by Providence Health & Services Oregon. (Choi, Edward)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Return of Service Executed as to Providence Health & Services Oregon served on 11/3/2021, answer due on 11/24/2021. (Olney, Margaret)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Providence Health & Services Oregon. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/25/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/28/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 3/28/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. to Compel Arbitration Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8287029 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon Nurses Association against Providence Health & Services Oregon (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet-ONA, #2 Proposed Summons Summons-Providence). (Olney, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oregon Nurses Association v. Providence Health & Services Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Nurses Association
Represented By: Margaret S. Olney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services Oregon
Represented By: Edward Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?