Misuraca v. Loke et al
Plaintiff: Airian Jovan Misuraca
Defendant: Jamie Lake, Harmony Jones, Bryan Rogers, Amy Braeminger, Amanda Godinez, Aimee Zerfas, Brenna Collins, Andrea Gillette, Kenia Salvesen, Mariah Myrland-Buell, Jon Doe, Jane Doe and Jamie Loke
Case Number: 3:2021cv01585
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines #14 . Plaintiff's Motion is premature because the defendants have not been served and the Court has not issued a scheduling order in this case. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (ki)
December 17, 2021 Filing 14 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Airian Jovan Misuraca. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT: The Court ORDERS Misuraca to file an amended complaint that includes all pages missing from the original filing (pages 2, 4, 6, 8, 9, 12, 14, 16, 18, 20, 22, 24, 26, 28, 30, 32, and 34) within thirty days of the date of this Order. The Court warns Misuraca that failure to file an amended complaint will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. The Court DENIES Misuraca's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #8 ) because he has demonstrated a sufficient ability to articulate his claims in light of the complexity of the case and, at this stage of the proceeding, has failed to demonstrate a likelihood of success on the merits. See Palmer v. Valdez, 560 F.3d 965, 970 (9th Cir. 2009). Misuraca may renew his request for counsel at a later stage of the proceeding. Signed on 12/16/2021 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: The Court GRANTS Misuraca's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #1 ). The Oregon Department of Corrections shall collect the balance of the filing fee and forward the funds to the Clerk of Court. A copy of this order has been emailed to the Central Trust Unit. Signed on 12/16/2021 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
December 16, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Summonses. Filed by Airian Jovan Misuraca. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
December 8, 2021 Filing 10 Exhibits. Filed by Airian Jovan Misuraca. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration of Airian Jovan Misuraca in Support of Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Airian Jovan Misuraca. (Related document(s): Motion for Appointment of Counsel. #8 .) **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Airian Jovan Misuraca.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of E-Mailing to Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033 regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge #6 . **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to the prison for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Defendant's Name Correction from Jamie Lake to Jamie Loke. Filed by Airian Jovan Misuraca. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Declaration of Edi Villalobos. Filed by Airian Jovan Misuraca. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Airian Jovan Misuraca against All Defendants. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Airian Jovan Misuraca. (Attachments: #1 Notice)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Airian Misuraca, Prisoner ID: 12413033) (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misuraca v. Loke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airian Jovan Misuraca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmony Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Braeminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Godinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Zerfas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenna Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenia Salvesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariah Myrland-Buell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Loke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?