Land Art & Design, LLC v. Pacific & Everest Lifestyle Co. et al
Plaintiff: Land Art & Design, LLC
Defendant: Pacific & Everest Lifestyle Co. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Poler and Vance L. Liebman
Case Number: 3:2021cv01633
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Change of Address. For counsel Fletcher Law, PLLC Filed by Land Art & Design, LLC. (Fletcher, Jordan)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #15 is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer the complaint and participate in an initial Rule 26(f) conference by 2/4/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 3, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (O'Brien, Sean)
November 17, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1. Filed by Land Art & Design, LLC. (Fletcher, Jordan)
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #8 upon Vance L. Liebman served on 11/15/2021 Filed by Land Art & Design, LLC. (Fletcher, Jordan)
November 17, 2021 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #8 upon Pacific & Everest Lifestyle Co. served on 11/15/2021 Filed by Land Art & Design, LLC. (Fletcher, Jordan)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 by attorney Jordan Fletcher. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The PDF document was an outdated form. The following corrections were made to the record: The original filing was submitted on an outdated form and has been replaced with the current form. (cw)
November 16, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jordan Fletcher. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8305258 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jordan Fletcher. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8305258. Filed by Land Art & Design, LLC. (Fletcher, Jordan) Modified on 11/15/2021 to correct text of the attorney who is requesting Pro Hac Vice counsel. (ecp). (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/16/2021) (cw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Vance L. Liebman, Pacific & Everest Lifestyle Co.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Land Art & Design, LLC. (Swider, Robert)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by Land Art & Design, LLC. (Swider, Robert)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Return of Service Unexecuted as to Vance L. Liebman. (Swider, Robert)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (joha) (Main Document 4 replaced with added attachment on 11/10/2021) (joha).
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/10/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/11/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 4/11/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Land Art & Design, LLC. (Swider, Robert)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8301091 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA 2-192-227--Land for Poler 2--Land Art & Design LLC, VA 2-211-536--Land for Poler 3--Land Art & Design LLC, VA 2-211-540--Land for Poler 4--Land Art & Design LLC, VA 2-211-542--Land for Poler 6--Land Art & Design LLC, VA 2-192-226--Land for Poler 7--Land Art & Design. Filed by Land Art & Design, LLC against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D). (Swider, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Land Art & Design, LLC v. Pacific & Everest Lifestyle Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Land Art & Design, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Swider
Represented By: Jordan Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific & Everest Lifestyle Co. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Poler
Represented By: Delfina S. Homen
Represented By: John Clarke
Represented By: Sean D. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance L. Liebman
Represented By: Delfina S. Homen
Represented By: John Clarke
Represented By: Sean D. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?