Equine Legal Solutions, PC v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Equine Legal Solutions, PC
Defendant: Margaret A Johnson, Touchstone, Bernays, Johnston, Beall, Smith & Stollenwerck, L.L.P., Willow Draw, LP, Orin Book, III, Janet Book, Tre Book and Stephen Barclay
Case Number: 3:2021cv01791
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service upon Willow Draw, LP served on 1/24/2022 Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
January 25, 2022 Filing 15 Affidavit of Service upon Tre Book served on 1/25/2022 Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
January 25, 2022 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service upon Orin Book, III served on 1/25/2022 Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
January 25, 2022 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service upon Janet Book served on 1/25/2022 Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
January 24, 2022 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service upon Stephen Barclay served on 1/22/2022 Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 issued summons janet book, #2 issued summons johnson, #3 issued summons orin book, #4 issued summons touchstone, #5 issued summons tre book, #6 issued summons willow draw lp) (ecp)
January 11, 2022 Filing 10 Proposed Summons to Defendant Willow Draw, LP Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
January 11, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons to Defendant Tre Book Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons to Defendant Touchstone, Bernays, Johnston, Beall, Smith & Stollenwerck, L.L.P. Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons to Defendant Orin M. Book III Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to Defendant Margaret A. Johnson Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to Defendant Janet Book Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Defendant Stephen Barclay Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/11/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/9/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 5/9/2022. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8336501 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Included copyrights: TX0007189931--Equine Boarding Agreement--Equine Legal Solutions, Inc.. Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (McCart, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equine Legal Solutions, PC v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equine Legal Solutions, PC
Represented By: Rachel E. McCart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touchstone, Bernays, Johnston, Beall, Smith & Stollenwerck, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willow Draw, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orin Book, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Book
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tre Book
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Barclay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?