Botts Marsh LLC v. City of Wheeler
Plaintiff: Botts Marsh LLC and Botts Marsh, LLC
Defendant: City of Wheeler
Case Number: 3:2022cv00115
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by City of Wheeler. (Mapes, Kevin)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time #6 . Defendant has until 3/18/2022 to file its appearance or other responsive pleading. (pjg)
February 16, 2022 Filing 7 Declaration of Kevin S. Mapes in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appearance. Filed by City of Wheeler. (Mapes, Kevin)
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appearance. Filed by City of Wheeler. (Mapes, Kevin)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon City of Wheeler served on 1/27/2022 Filed by Botts Marsh, LLC. (Edwards, Amy)
January 24, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Wheeler. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 Corrected Proposed Summons Filed by Botts Marsh, LLC. (Edwards, Amy)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/24/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/23/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 6/23/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sb)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8381614 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Botts Marsh LLC against City of Wheeler (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Edwards, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Botts Marsh LLC v. City of Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Botts Marsh LLC
Represented By: Amy Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Botts Marsh, LLC
Represented By: Amy Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wheeler
Represented By: Kevin S. Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?