Equine Legal Solutions, PC v. This Old Horse, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Equine Legal Solutions, PC
Defendant: This Old Horse, Inc., Nancy Turner, Jotform Inc. and Google LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00269
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Referring Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Nancy Turner. (Wardlow, William)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by This Old Horse, Inc.. (Wardlow, William)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by This Old Horse, Inc.. (Wardlow, William)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Jotform Inc.. (Ostrander, John)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of William Wardlow appearing on behalf of This Old Horse, Inc., Nancy Turner. Filed by This Old Horse, Inc., Nancy Turner. (Wardlow, William)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Defendant Jotform, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, ECF #18 . Jotform, Inc.'s answer or other responsive pleading is due by May 18, 2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Jotform Inc.. (Ostrander, John)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of John D. Ostrander appearing on behalf of Jotform Inc.. Filed by Jotform Inc.. (Ostrander, John)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Defendant Google LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #14 . Google LLC's answer or other responsive pleading is due by May 18, 2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Google LLC. (Clarke, John)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Google LLC. (Clarke, John)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Affidavit of Service upon Jotform Inc. served on 3/24/2022 Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jotform Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (dino)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Amended Proposed Summons to Defendant JotForm Inc. Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Proposed Summons to Defendant JotForm Inc. Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Nancy Turner waiver sent on 2/17/2022. Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by This Old Horse, Inc. waiver sent on 2/17/2022. Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Google LLC waiver sent on 3/15/2022. Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (dino)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/17/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/18/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 7/18/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (dino)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC. (McCart, Rachel)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8415309 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Included copyrights: TX0007394786--Equine Donation Agreement--Equine Legal Solutions, Inc., TX0007189931--Equine Boarding Agreement and Instructions--Equine Legal Solutions, Inc., TX0008398596--Equine Boarding Forms Package--Equine Legal Solutions, Inc.. Filed by Equine Legal Solutions, PC against All Defendants. (McCart, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equine Legal Solutions, PC v. This Old Horse, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equine Legal Solutions, PC
Represented By: Rachel E. McCart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: This Old Horse, Inc.
Represented By: William Wardlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Turner
Represented By: William Wardlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jotform Inc.
Represented By: John D. Ostrander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: John Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?