Rocket Software, Inc. et al v. CollegeNET, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rocket Software, Inc. and Rocket Software B.V.
Defendant: CollegeNET, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00327
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey Armistead
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Armistead: GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #15 filed by Attorney Theresa H. Wang. (pjg)
April 27, 2022 Filing 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Theresa H. Wang. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8497243. Filed by Rocket Software B.V., Rocket Software, Inc.. (Wang, Theresa)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: GRANTING Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #12 requested by Attorney Michael Roy Williams and #13 requested by Attorney Alexis Paschedag Federico. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (pjg)
April 27, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Theresa H. Wang. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8497243 #15 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 26, 2022 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Alexis Paschedag Federico. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8496465. Filed by CollegeNET, Inc.. (Federico, Alexis)
April 26, 2022 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael Roy Williams. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: CORDC-8496410. Filed by CollegeNET, Inc.. (Williams, Michael)
April 26, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Alexis Paschedag Federico. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8496465 #13 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 26, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael Roy Williams. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: CORDC-8496410 #12 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Armistead: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 . Deadline for filing of a response to the compliant is extended to 5/6/2022. (pjg)
April 18, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer / Respond to Complaint,, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Lovett, Steven)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to CollegeNET, Inc. served on 4/1/2022, answer due on 4/22/2022. (Fetters, John)
March 24, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Armistead. (cw)
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (sb)
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to CollegeNET, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/30/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/1/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 8/1/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sb)
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Rocket Software B.V., Rocket Software, Inc.. (Fetters, John)
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing an Action Regarding a Copyright Filed by Rocket Software B.V., Rocket Software, Inc.. (Fetters, John)
March 1, 2022 Filing 2 Report on the Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Filed by Rocket Software B.V., Rocket Software, Inc.. (Fetters, John)
March 1, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8426150 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Included copyrights: TX0008445094--Uniface APS 9.7.04.--Uniface B.V., TX0008445102--Uniface 10.2.02.--Uniface B.V., TX0008711369--Uniface 10.3.02.--Uniface B.V., TX0008711793--Uniface 9.7.05.--Uniface B.V., TX0008711795--Uniface 10.3.01.--Uniface B.V.. Filed by Rocket Software, Inc., Rocket Software B.V. against CollegeNET, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Fetters, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocket Software, Inc. et al v. CollegeNET, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocket Software, Inc.
Represented By: John Thomas Fetters
Represented By: Theresa H. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocket Software B.V.
Represented By: John Thomas Fetters
Represented By: Theresa H. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CollegeNET, Inc.
Represented By: Alexis Paschedag Federico
Represented By: Elliott J. Williams
Represented By: Michael Roy Williams
Represented By: Steven T. Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?