Black et al v. PacifiCorp et al
Plaintiff: Susan Black, Dyarla Burns, Sean Leyland Campbell, Dianna Lynn Ekis, Shane Ayrsman, Bare Roots Farm, LLC, Sarah Devore, Michael Garnier, Peggy Malone, Out N About Treehouse Treesort, LLC, Treehouse Zip Line, LLC, Angela Graves, Elijah Graves, Jeremy Harrison, Misty Main, Bill Jackson, Peter Camemdzen, Jonathan Hulse, Cheri Johnson, Ashley Nicole Larson, Adam Meives, Jodie Moskios, Phillip Moskios, Alice W. Raviolo, John B. Raviolo, Walter Slater, Anathea Sparrow and Aaron Vail
Defendant: PacifiCorp and Pacific Power
Case Number: 3:2022cv00566
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Alison Plessman's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #11 ; Granting Will Larsen's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #12 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Remand #9 . Defendant's Response is due 6/27/2022. Any request for further extensions must be filed not less than 7 days before the expiration of the new deadline. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
June 7, 2022 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Will Larsen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8542748. Filed by PacifiCorp, Pacific Power. (Larsen, Will)
June 7, 2022 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Alison Plessman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8542726. Filed by PacifiCorp, Pacific Power. (Plessman, Alison)
June 7, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to a Motion. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
June 7, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Will Larsen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8542748 #12 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
June 7, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Alison Plessman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8542726 #11 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
June 6, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #8 . Filed by PacifiCorp, Pacific Power. (Chase, Crystal) (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/7/2022) (cw).
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Susan Dussault, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Dussault, Susan)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand #6 . Motion to be filed by 5/23/2022. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dussault, Susan)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by PacifiCorp, Pacific Power. (Ramfjord, Per)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 8/15/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/12/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 9/12/2022. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (kgc)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Ramfjord, Per)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 Declaration of Per A. Ramfjord . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7) (Ramfjord, Per)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 22CV08622 from Circuit Court of the State of Oregon, County of Multnomah. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8480781 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by PacifiCorp, Pacific Power (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Ramfjord, Per)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black et al v. PacifiCorp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Black
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyarla Burns
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Leyland Campbell
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna Lynn Ekis
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Ayrsman
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bare Roots Farm, LLC
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Devore
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Garnier
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Malone
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Out N About Treehouse Treesort, LLC
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treehouse Zip Line, LLC
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Graves
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Graves
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Harrison
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Main
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Jackson
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Camemdzen
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hulse
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Johnson
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Nicole Larson
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Meives
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Moskios
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Moskios
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice W. Raviolo
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Raviolo
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Slater
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anathea Sparrow
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Vail
Represented By: Gerald Singleton
Represented By: Susan B. Dussault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacifiCorp
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Alison Plessman
Represented By: Will Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Power
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Alison Plessman
Represented By: Will Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?