Vongkoth v. PCC Structurals Inc et al
Plaintiff: Vilasack Vongkoth
Defendant: PCC Structurals Inc, Cigna Insurance Company of North America and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00681
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey Armistead
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 10 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by PCC Structurals Inc. (Shaddy-Farnsworth, Madeleine)
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Cigna Insurance Company of North America, Life Insurance Company of North America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 issued summons) (ecp)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons Filed by Vilasack Vongkoth. (Wagner, David)
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons Filed by Vilasack Vongkoth. (Wagner, David)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Armistead: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 . Answer is due by 6/15/2022. (pjg)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by PCC Structurals Inc. (Healy, Melissa)
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 Filed by PCC Structurals Inc. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings) (Healy, Melissa)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/6/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/6/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 10/6/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (ecp)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by PCC Structurals Inc. (Healy, Melissa)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 22CV07323 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8510561 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by PCC Structurals Inc (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Healy, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vongkoth v. PCC Structurals Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vilasack Vongkoth
Represented By: Charles R. Hathaway
Represented By: David B. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCC Structurals Inc
Represented By: Karen L. O'Connor
Represented By: Madeleine Sophie Shaddy-Farnsworth
Represented By: Melissa J. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?