Mason v. Themarysue, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Mason
Defendant: THEMARYSUE, LLC, Gamurs, Inc., TriNet HR III, Inc., Andrew Eisbrouch, Dan Van Winkle and Kaila Hale-Stern
Case Number: 3:2022cv00766
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by All Defendants. (Copple, Anthony)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Scheduling Order: SETTING Telephonic Oral Argument for Tuesday, August 2, 2022, at 09:30AM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You regarding Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #16 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Reply to Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #16 . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Copple, Anthony)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Notice of Appearance of Anthony Copple appearing on behalf of Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Copple, Anthony)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants #30 is granted. Attorneys Michael J. Sandmire and Daniel L. Lis are withdrawn as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants. Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Sandmire, Michael)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Party . Filed by TriNet HR III, Inc.. (Wheatley, Alexander)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Answer to Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs' TheMarySue, LLC, Gamurs, Inc., Andrew Eisbrouch, Dan Van Winkle, and Kaila Hale-Stern's Counterclaim. Filed by Jessica Mason. (Mason, Heidi)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Declaration of Heidi Mason in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer #25 . Filed by Jessica Mason. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Exhibit B, #3 Attachment Exhibit C, #4 Attachment Exhibit D) (Mason, Heidi) Modified on 6/15/2022 to add link to document in support (ecp).
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Declaration of Jessica Mason in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer #25 . Filed by Jessica Mason. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibit A) (Mason, Heidi) Modified on 6/15/2022 to add link to document in support (ecp).
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Response in Opposition to Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #16 . Filed by Jessica Mason. (Mason, Heidi)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Declaration of Ian Naramore in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Related document(s): Motion to change/transfer venue #16 .) (Sandmire, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Declaration of Rachel Leishman in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Related document(s): Motion to change/transfer venue #16 .) (Sandmire, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Declaration of Princess Weekes in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Related document(s): Motion to change/transfer venue #16 .) (Sandmire, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Declaration of Riad Chikhani in Support of Motion to Transfer. Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Related document(s): Motion to change/transfer venue #16 .) (Sandmire, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Declaration of Kaila Hale-Stern in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Related document(s): Motion to change/transfer venue #16 .) (Sandmire, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Declaration of Dan Van Winkle in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Related document(s): Motion to change/transfer venue #16 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sandmire, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Declaration of Andrew Eisbrouch in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Related document(s): Motion to change/transfer venue #16 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sandmire, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Declaration of Theresa Dira in Support of Motion to Transfer. Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Related document(s): Motion to change/transfer venue #16 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sandmire, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Motion to Change or Transfer Venue . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, Themarysue, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Sandmire, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand , Counterclaim Against Jessica Mason. Filed by Gamurs, Inc., Themarysue, LLC, Andrew Eisbrouch, Dan Van Winkle, Kaila Hale-Stern. (Sandmire, Michael)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/23/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/24/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (kgc)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Amended Declaration of Kaila Hale-Stern in Support of Notice of Removal. #1 Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Sandmire, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2022 to add link to document in support (ecp).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Amended Declaration of Andrew Eisbrouch in Support of Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Sandmire, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2022 to add link to document in support (ecp).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Amended Declaration of Riad Chikhani in Support of Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Sandmire, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2022 to add link to document in support (ecp).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Declaration of Ian Naramore in Support of Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Sandmire, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2022 to add link to document in support(ecp).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Declaration of Riad Chikhani in Support of Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Sandmire, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2022 to add link to document in support(ecp).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Declaration of Dan Van Winkle in Support of Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Sandmire, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2022 to add link to document in support (ecp).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Declaration of Kaila Hale-Stern in Support of Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Sandmire, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2022 to add link to document in support (ecp).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Declaration of Andrew Eisbrouch in Support of Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Sandmire, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2022 to add link to document in support (ecp).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Declaration of Floyd Abrams in Support of Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Sandmire, Michael) Modified on 5/27/2022 to add link to document in support(ecp).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Declaration of Daniel Abrams in Support of Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Sandmire, Michael) Modified on 5/27/2022 to add link to document in support (ecp).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Declaration of Theresa Dira in Support of Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Sandmire, Michael) Modified on 5/27/2022 to add link to document in support(ecp).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Andrew Eisbrouch, Gamurs, Inc., Kaila Hale-Stern, THEMARYSUE, LLC, Dan Van Winkle. (Sandmire, Michael)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 22CV13858 from Washington County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8530633 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Gamurs, Inc., THEMARYSUE, LLC, Andrew Eisbrouch, Dan Van Winkle, Kaila Hale-Stern (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Sandmire, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Themarysue, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Mason
Represented By: Heidi W. Mason
Represented By: Ronald G. Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEMARYSUE, LLC
Represented By: Daniel L. Lis
Represented By: Michael J. Sandmire
Represented By: Anthony Copple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gamurs, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L. Lis
Represented By: Michael J. Sandmire
Represented By: Anthony Copple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TriNet HR III, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander A. Wheatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Eisbrouch
Represented By: Daniel L. Lis
Represented By: Michael J. Sandmire
Represented By: Anthony Copple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Van Winkle
Represented By: Daniel L. Lis
Represented By: Michael J. Sandmire
Represented By: Anthony Copple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaila Hale-Stern
Represented By: Daniel L. Lis
Represented By: Michael J. Sandmire
Represented By: Anthony Copple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?