Michael Goergen v. Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Goergen
Defendant: Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC, American Arbitration Association, George A Finkle and Does 1 to 25
Case Number: 3:2022cv01258
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER - The Court has now resolved the parties' dispute regarding a Protective Order and hereby lifts the suspension of the briefing schedule on the pending question of arbitrability. Defendant shall file its first brief regarding arbitrability not later than October 27, 2022. Both parties shall file their response briefs not later than November 10, 2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 3:22-cv-01260-SI (mja)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Protective Order. Signed on 10/19/2022 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 3:22-cv-01260-SI (mja)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Reply to Motion for Protective Order (42 in 3:22-cv-01260-SI). Filed by Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC.Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 3:22-cv-01260-SI (Asai, Kristin)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 First Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Black Coffee Bar LLC's to Motion for Protective Order (42 in 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 39 in 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 42 in 3:22-cv-01260-SI). Filed by All Plaintiffs.Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 3:22-cv-01260-SI (Reden, Justin)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 First Request for Judicial Notice In Support of their Brief on the Issues of Arbitrability. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs.Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 3:22-cv-01260-SI (Reden, Justin)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 First Declaration of Justin G. Reden, Esq. Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Brief On The Issues of Arbitrability. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 3:22-cv-01260-SI (Reden, Justin)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Brief Plaintiff's Brief Re Arbitration. Filed by All Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 3:22-cv-01260-SI (Reden, Justin)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER - Black Rock Coffee Bar has filed a Motion for Entry of Protective Order, which Plaintiffs in the consolidated cases oppose. The Court will accelerate briefing. Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to Black Rock's motion is due Friday, October 14, and Black Rock may file a reply by October 19. The Court suspends the briefing schedule on the pending question of arbitrability, see ECF 41 , until after the motion for protective order has been resolved. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 3:22-cv-01260-SI (mja)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed Protective Order))Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 3:22-cv-01260-SI (Asai, Kristin)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: As discussed on the record, Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC withdraws all pending motions to dismiss or transfer. ORDER - The Court sets a briefing schedule on all questions of arbitrability as follows: All parties will submit initial briefs not later than October 10, 2022; response briefs will be due by October 24, 2022; and reply briefs are due by November 7, 2022. The Court will endeavor to resolve all issues as appropriate, not later than the end of November. Justin Reden present as counsel for Plaintiff. Kristin M. Asai and Joseph L. Franco present as counsel for Defendant. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 3:22-cv-01260-SI (mja)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Scheduling Order - The Court sets a Telephone Status Conference for 9/14/2022 at 10:00 a.m. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-01258-SI, 3:22-cv-01259-SI, 3:22-cv-01260-SI (mja)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - Pursuant to the request of the parties, the Court consolidates cases 3:22-cv-1258-SI, 3:22-cv-1259-SI, and 3:22-cv-1260-SI. The Court designates Case No. 3:22-cv-1258-SI as the lead case. Going forward, all motions, documents, and other matters shall be filed in Lead Case No. 3:22-cv-1258-SI. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Status Report by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Reden, Justin)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Status Report by Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. Filed by Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Asai, Kristin)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Justin Reden, ECF #35 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Justin Reden. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8639936. Filed by Michael Goergen. (Reden, Justin)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Justin Reden. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8639936 #35 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: and Substitution of Attorney Filed by Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. (Asai, Kristin)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Clerk's Notice of Mailing regarding Notice of Non-Admitted Counsel ECF #30 and Order ECF #32 to Plaintiff's Counsel on 8/26/2022. (mja)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - Three related cases, 3:22-cv-1258-SI, 3:22-cv-1259-SI, and 3:22-cv-1260-SI, have been transferred to this Court from the Central District of California. Defendants American Arbitration Association and George A Finkle have been voluntarily dismissed from each lawsuit, leaving only Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. The parties are directed to file by September 2, 2022, a summary of the underlying facts of each case, the status of each case, what (if anything) remains pending in each case for this Court to resolve, whether the pending items are fully briefed, and what (if any) action the parties request the Court take at this time. Further, the parties should indicate whether the three cases should be consolidated for any purpose. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the District of Central District of California. Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website.. (eo)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:22-cv-00797. Electronic file received.
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendants American Arbitration Association, George A Finkle pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to American Arbitration Association, George A Finkle. (Kelson, Bruce) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge David O. Carter re: Status Conference #26 . AMENDED 4/27/22. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Courts scheduling order to issue. The Court finds as follows: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Kristin M. Asai APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC, designating David A. Robinson as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kristin M. Asai to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33177386) #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an Application, not an Ex Parte document. Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #16 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint #18 filed by Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harvey, Jacqueline) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kristin M. Asai to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33177386) filed by Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Robinson, David) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Status Conference re Case Consolidation set for 4/25/2022 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Kristin Asai on behalf of Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Pro hac vice application forthcoming upon receipt of necessary certificates of good standing. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney J. Matthew Donohue on behalf of Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Pro hac vice application forthcoming upon receipt of necessary certificates of good standing. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint filed by Defendants American Arbitration Association, George A Finkle. Motion set for hearing on 5/16/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Kelson, Bruce) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of Kristin Asai In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #16 filed by Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Pereboom Decl.), #2 Exhibit 2 (Orange County Complaint), #3 Exhibit 3 (Order on Motion to Quash))(Harvey, Jacqueline) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/16/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harvey, Jacqueline) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant George A Finkle, identifying The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. (Attorney Bruce B. Kelson added to party George A Finkle(pty:dft))(Kelson, Bruce) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Arbitration Association, identifying Nat'l Union Fire Insurance Co. (an AIG Co.). (Attorney Bruce B. Kelson added to party American Arbitration Association(pty:dft))(Kelson, Bruce) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC. Combined Notice of Related Cases and Notice Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Related Case(s): 8:22-cv-803 and 8:22-cv-796 (Harvey, Jacqueline) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE DAVID O. CARTER by Judge David O. Carter. (kdu) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:22-cv-00796-DOC-DFMx. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-00797-DOC(DFMx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (dta) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kristin Asai. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney J. Matthew Donohue. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants American Arbitration Association, Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC, Does, George A Finkle., filed by Plaintiff Michael Goergen. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/23/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 AND NO. 2 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC an Oregon limited liability company, identifying Black Rock Coffee Holdings, LLC. (Harvey, Jacqueline) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC an Oregon limited liability company. (Harvey, Jacqueline) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022-01246861-CU-PA-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-33111653 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC an Oregon limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint (part 1), #2 State Court Complaint (part 2), #3 State Court Cover Sheet, #4 State Court Summons) (Attorney Jacqueline Nicole Harvey added to party Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC an Oregon limited liability company(pty:dft))(Harvey, Jacqueline) [Transferred from California Central on 8/24/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Goergen v. Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Goergen
Represented By: Justin G Reden
Represented By: Michael John Riddell
Represented By: Casey Matthew Arbenz
Represented By: Justin Reden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Rock Coffee Bar, LLC
Represented By: David A. Robinson
Represented By: Jacqueline Nicole Harvey
Represented By: Kristin M. Asai
Represented By: J. Matthew Donohue
Represented By: Joseph L. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Arbitration Association
Represented By: Bruce B. Kelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A Finkle
Represented By: Bruce B. Kelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?