Laschober v. Cardona et al
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Laschober
Defendant: Dr. Miguel A. Cardona, Department of Education and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv01373
Filed: September 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (dino)
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Department of Education. (dino)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/11/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/10/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 2/10/2023. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/13/2022.) (dino)
September 12, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Miguel A. Cardona. (dino)
September 12, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. (Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction) Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Receipt No. 99609. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Daniel T. Laschober against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (dino)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laschober v. Cardona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Laschober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Miguel A. Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?