Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc. v. Juanita's Foods
Plaintiff: Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Juanita's Foods
Case Number: 3:2022cv01691
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Request for Judicial Notice in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Def's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (McStay, P.)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #21 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc.. (McStay, P.)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Response in Opposition to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice.(Related document(s): Request for Judicial Notice, #23 .) Filed by Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc.. (McStay, P.)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Request for Judicial Notice Motion to Dismiss #21 . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Juanita's Foods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Davis, Kenneth)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Declaration of A. Sasha Frid . Filed by Juanita's Foods. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #21 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Davis, Kenneth)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Juanita's Foods. (Davis, Kenneth)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #17 ) for Louis R. Miller. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #16 ) for Jeffery B. White. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #15 ) for Alexander Frid. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Louis Miller. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8741674. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Juanita's Foods. (Miller, Louis)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jeffery B. White. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8741658. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Juanita's Foods. (Frid, Alexander) Modified on 12/2/2022 to correct attorney's name requesting Pro Hac Vice admission(ecp).
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Alexander Frid. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8741565. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Juanita's Foods. (Frid, Alexander)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Louis Miller. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8741674 #17 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jeffrey B. White. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8741658 #16 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp) Modified on to correct attorney's name requesting Pro Hac Vice admission12/2/2022 (ecp).
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Alexander Frid. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8741565 #15 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #13 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 12/9/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Juanita's Foods. (Davis, Kenneth)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to Juanita's Foods served on 11/3/2022, answer due on 11/25/2022. (Wiggins, Sherron)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #10 ) for Sherron L. Wiggins. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Sherron L Wiggins. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8711582 #10 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Sherron L Wiggins. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8711582. Filed by Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc.. (Wiggins, Sherron)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #7 ) for Heming Xu. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #6 ) for Rasheed McWilliams. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Rasheed McWilliams. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8710110 #6 and by attorney Heming Xu. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8710152 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Heming Xu. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8710152. Filed by Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc.. (Xu, Heming)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Rasheed McWilliams. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8710110. Filed by Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc.. (McWilliams, Rasheed)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc.. (McStay, P.)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/2/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/3/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 4/3/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (ecp)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Juanita's Foods. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. for Declaratory Judgment. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8709156 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Included patents/trademarks: 97/643,118--10/21/2022--Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc., 1,268,693--2/28/1984--Juanita's Foods, 3,707,436--11/10/2009--Juanita's Foods, 1,297,863--9/25/1984--Juanita's Foods, 1,554,914--9/5/1989--Juanita's Foods. Filed by Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc. against Juanita's Foods (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Attachment, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons). (McStay, P.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc. v. Juanita's Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominguez Family Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: P. Andrew McStay, Jr.
Represented By: Heming Xu
Represented By: Rasheed McWilliams
Represented By: Sherron L Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita's Foods
Represented By: Jeffery White
Represented By: Alexander Frid
Represented By: Louis Miller
Represented By: Kenneth R. Davis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?