Jefferson Packing House, LLC v. Kotek et al
Plaintiff: JEFFERSON PACKING HOUSE, LLC
Defendant: Governor Kate Brown, Ellen Rosenblum, Steven Marks, Kate Brown, Tina Kotek and Craig Prins
Case Number: 3:2022cv01776
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey Armistead
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Interstate Commerce Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Filing 16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #7 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Jefferson Packing House, LLC. (DeWeese, Andrew)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The court GRANTS plaintiff's second motion for extension of time (#14 ). Plaintiff must respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (#7 ) by 3/17/2023. Motion will be taken under advisement on 6/7/2023. The court will disfavor an additional extension of time, and a motion for more time must assert good cause and an effective use of prior time, as required by LR 16-3. If that motion is filed, the court may hold a status conference to discuss the asserted bases for the request for extension. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (pjg)
March 2, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #7 . Filed by Jefferson Packing House, LLC. (DeWeese, Andrew)
February 21, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Substitution of Defendant Filed by Jefferson Packing House, LLC. (Jacoby, Kevin)
February 6, 2023 Filing 12 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #10 . Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #7 is due by 3/3/2023. Motion will be taken under advisement as of 5/24/2023. Request for oral argument will be considered in due course. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (pjg) Modified text on 2/3/2023 (pjg).
February 2, 2023 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #7 . Filed by Jefferson Packing House, LLC. (DeWeese, Andrew)
February 2, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution: Bijal C Patel is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Shannon M. Vincent . Filed by on behalf of Tina Kotek, Steven Marks, Ellen Rosenblum. (Patel, Bijal)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order: Motion to Dismiss #7 is taken under advisement as of 4/24/2023. Requests for oral argument shall be considered in due course. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (pjg)
January 20, 2023 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Filed by Steven Marks, Tina Kotek, Ellen Rosenblum. (Vincent, Shannon)
January 9, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Substitution of Defendant Filed by Jefferson Packing House, LLC. (DeWeese, Andrew)
December 1, 2022 Filing 5 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Ellen Rosenblum waiver sent on 11/30/2022. Filed by Jefferson Packing House, LLC. (DeWeese, Andrew)
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Steven Marks waiver sent on 11/30/2022. Filed by Jefferson Packing House, LLC. (DeWeese, Andrew)
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Kate Brown waiver sent on 11/30/2022. Filed by Jefferson Packing House, LLC. (DeWeese, Andrew)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/16/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/17/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 4/17/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (kgc)
November 16, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8721698. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by JEFFERSON PACKING HOUSE, LLC against all defendants. (DeWeese, Andrew) Modified on 11/16/2022 to add payment information (kgc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson Packing House, LLC v. Kotek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERSON PACKING HOUSE, LLC
Represented By: Andrew C. DeWeese
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Kate Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Rosenblum
Represented By: YoungWoo Joh
Represented By: Bijal C Patel
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Kotek
Represented By: YoungWoo Joh
Represented By: Bijal C Patel
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Prins
Represented By: YoungWoo Joh
Represented By: Bijal C Patel
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?