Eyre et al v. Rosenblum et al
Plaintiff: Katerina B Eyre, Tim Freeman, Mazama Sporting Goods, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. and Oregon State Shooting Association
Defendant: Ellen F Rosenblum, Terri Davie and Oregon Hunters Association
Intervenor Defendant: Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety
Amicus Curiae: Congressional Sportsmen's Foundation, The Rocky Mountain Elk Foundation, Sportsmen's Alliance Foundation, Oregon Wild Sheep Foundation, Safari Club International, National Deer Association, Delta Waterfowl, Ducks Unlimited, Ducks Unlimited, Inc., Operation Blazing Sword, Inc., DC Project Foundation, Inc., Asian Pacific American Gun Owners Association and National African American Gun Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01862
Filed: December 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2023 Filing 93 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding (111 in 2:22-cv-01815-IM) Declaration,. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: An incorrect PDF was attached to the entry. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (cw)
January 26, 2023 Filing 92 Corrected Declaration of Clayton Cramer (Magazine Issue). Filed by Cody Bowen, Damian Bunting, Harold Richard Haden, Jr, Adam Johnson, Brad Lohrey, Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc., Brian Pixley, Terry Rowan, Kevin Starrett, Brian Wolfe. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Williamson, Leonard)
January 25, 2023 Filing 91 Declaration of Leonard W. Williamson . Filed by Cody Bowen, Damian Bunting, Harold Richard Haden, Jr, Adam Johnson, Brad Lohrey, Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc., Brian Pixley, Terry Rowan, Kevin Starrett, Brian Wolfe. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Williamson, Leonard)
January 24, 2023 Filing 90 Corrected Declaration of Stephen Helsley . Filed by Cody Bowen, Damian Bunting, Harold Richard Haden, Jr, Adam Johnson, Brad Lohrey, Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc., Brian Pixley, Terry Rowan, Kevin Starrett, Brian Wolfe. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Williamson, Leonard)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Minutes of Proceeding: Status Conference held on 1/19/2023 regarding the scheduled preliminary injunction hearing, the potential appointment of a court-appointed expert, and Plaintiffs' request for a protective order, which was received via email on 1/19/2023. (Attached). As stated on the record, this Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request for a blanket protective order. If information arises in the course of discovery which any party believes requires the entry of a limited protective order, the parties may seek such a limited order from this Court. This Court reserves decision as to whether the Court will select a court-appointed expert. In addition, this Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to submit briefing to address the issue of whether there would be any remaining case or controversy for this Court to adjudicate if the Oregon Supreme Court finds Ballot Measure 114 violates the Oregon Constitution. Plaintiffs' brief is not to exceed 8 pages and is due on 2/2/2023. Defendant and Defendant-Intervenor's Responses are due on 2/9/2023 and are not to exceed 8 pages. Ordered on 1/19/2023 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Stephen J. Joncus, Shawn M. Lindsay, D. Angus Lee, and Matthew Rowen present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Brian Simmonds Marshall, Harry B. Wilson, and Hannah Hoffman present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Karin J. Immergut presiding. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
January 19, 2023 Filing 88 Notice of Appearance of Erin N. Dawson appearing on behalf of Terri Davie, Ellen F Rosenblum, Kate Brown, Terri Davie, Ellen F Rosenblum, Ellen Rosenblum, Terri Davie, Ellen Rosenblum, Terri Davie, Ellen Rosenblum. Filed by on behalf of Terri Davie, Ellen F Rosenblum, Kate Brown, Terri Davie, Ellen F Rosenblum, Ellen Rosenblum, Terri Davie, Ellen Rosenblum, Terri Davie, Ellen Rosenblum.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Dawson, Erin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 87 Joint Brief Submission on Rule 706 Witnesses. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Scheduling Order,, (35 in 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 26 in 3:22-cv-01869-IM, 47 in 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 63 in 2:22-cv-01815-IM).)Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Lindsay, Shawn)
January 13, 2023 Filing 86 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Michael R. McLane on behalf of Ducks Unlimited, Inc., Oregon Hunters Association . Filed by on behalf of Ducks Unlimited, Inc., Oregon Hunters Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of P. Donheffner ISO Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit Declaration of E. May ISO Amicus Brief, #3 Exhibit Declaration of K. Parkman ISO Amicus Brief, #4 Exhibit Declaration of J. Nash ISO Amicus Brief)Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 13, 2023 Filing 85 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Michael R. McLane on behalf of Asian Pacific American Gun Owners Association, DC Project Foundation, Inc., National African American Gun Association, Inc., Operation Blazing Sword, Inc. . Filed by on behalf of Asian Pacific American Gun Owners Association, DC Project Foundation, Inc., National African American Gun Association, Inc., Operation Blazing Sword, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Decl. of S. Williams ISO Amicus Brief, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Decl. of P. Pressgrove ISO Amicus Brief)Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 13, 2023 Filing 84 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Michael R. McLane on behalf of Congressional Sportsmen's Foundation, Delta Waterfowl, Ducks Unlimited, National Deer Association, Oregon Hunters Association, Oregon Wild Sheep Foundation, Safari Club International, Sportsmen's Alliance Foundation, The Rocky Mountain Elk Foundation . Filed by on behalf of Congressional Sportsmen's Foundation, Delta Waterfowl, Ducks Unlimited, National Deer Association, Oregon Hunters Association, Oregon Wild Sheep Foundation, Safari Club International, Sportsmen's Alliance Foundation, The Rocky Mountain Elk Foundation. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Scheduling Order. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/19/2023 at 10:00AM in Portland by telephone before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Regina Lennox(90) in case 2:22-cv-01815-IM. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR AS AMICUS CURIAE: Granting Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae, ECF 97 , filed by Asian Pacific American Gun Owners Association, DC Project Foundation, Inc., National African American Gun Association, Inc., and Operation Blazing Sword, Inc. Ordered on 1/12/2023 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR AS AMICUS CURIAE: Granting Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae, ECF #92 , filed by Ducks Unlimited, Inc. and Oregon Hunters Association. Ordered on 1/12/2023 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR AS AMICUS CURIAE: Granting Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae, ECF #88 , filed by Congressional Sportsmen's Foundation, Delta Waterfowl, Ducks Unlimited, National Deer Association, Oregon Hunters Association, Oregon Wild Sheep Foundation, Safari Club International, Sportsmen's Alliance Foundation, and the Rocky Mountain Elk Foundation. Ordered on 1/12/2023 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
January 12, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Regina Lennox. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: ORDC-8782252(58 in 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 71 in 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 90 in 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 49 in 3:22-cv-01869-IM) : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 11, 2023 Filing 78 Unopposed Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae , Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Filed by Asian Pacific American Gun Owners Association, DC Project Foundation, Inc., National African American Gun Association, Inc., Operation Blazing Sword, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Amicus Brief, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Amicus Brief (Decl. of S. Williams), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Amicus Brief (Decl. of P. Pressgrove))Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 11, 2023 Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by National African American Gun Association, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 11, 2023 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Asian Pacific American Gun Owners Association. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 11, 2023 Filing 75 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by DC Project Foundation, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 11, 2023 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Operation Blazing Sword, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 11, 2023 Filing 73 Unopposed Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae , Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Filed by Ducks Unlimited, Inc., Oregon Hunters Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit Declaration of P. Donheffner ISO Amicus Brief, #3 Exhibit Declaration of E. May ISO Amicus Brief, #4 Exhibit Declaration of K. Parkman ISO Amicus Brief, #5 Exhibit Declaration of J. Nash ISO Amicus Brief)Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 11, 2023 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Oregon Hunters Association. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 11, 2023 Filing 71 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Regina Lennox. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: ORDC-8782252. Filed by Safari Club International.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Lennox, Regina)
January 11, 2023 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Ducks Unlimited, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 11, 2023 Filing 69 Unopposed Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae . Filed by Congressional Sportsmen's Foundation, Delta Waterfowl, Ducks Unlimited, National Deer Association, Oregon Hunters Association, Oregon Wild Sheep Foundation, Safari Club International, Sportsmen's Alliance Foundation, The Rocky Mountain Elk Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief)Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 11, 2023 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Oregon Hunters Association, Congressional Sportsmen's Foundation, The Rocky Mountain Elk Foundation, Sportsmen's Alliance Foundation, Oregon Wild Sheep Foundation, Safari Club International, National Deer Association, Delta Waterfowl, Ducks Unlimited. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (McLane, Michael)
January 6, 2023 Filing 67 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Cody Bowen, Damian Bunting, Harold Richard Haden, Jr, Adam Johnson, Brad Lohrey, Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc., Brian Pixley, Terry Rowan, Kevin Starrett, Brian Wolfe.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Joncus, Stephen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 66 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Eyre Plaintiffs). Filed by Katerina B Eyre, Tim Freeman, Mazama Sporting Goods, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Oregon State Shooting Association. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Lindsay, Shawn)
January 6, 2023 Filing 65 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Mark Fitz, G4 Archery, LLC, Grayguns, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Buchal, James)
January 6, 2023 Filing 64 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Azzopardi Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Daniel Azzopardi, Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Buchal, James)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Granting Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae, ECF #65 , by David Morello. Ordered on 1/6/2023 by Judge Karin J. Immergut.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
January 6, 2023 Filing 62 Declaration of Mark Hanish . Filed by Cody Bowen, Damian Bunting, Harold Richard Haden, Jr, Adam Johnson, Brad Lohrey, Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc., Brian Pixley, Terry Rowan, Kevin Starrett, Brian Wolfe. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Joncus, Stephen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 61 Declaration of Stephen Helsley . Filed by Cody Bowen, Damian Bunting, Harold Richard Haden, Jr, Adam Johnson, Brad Lohrey, Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc., Brian Pixley, Terry Rowan, Kevin Starrett, Brian Wolfe. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Joncus, Stephen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 60 Second Declaration of Kevin L Campbell . Filed by Katerina B Eyre, Tim Freeman, Mazama Sporting Goods, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Oregon State Shooting Association. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Lindsay, Shawn) Modified on 1/6/2023 to correct docket text list of filers. (ecp).
January 6, 2023 Filing 59 Second Declaration of Jason Myers . Filed by Katerina B Eyre, Tim Freeman, Mazama Sporting Goods, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Oregon State Shooting Association. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Lindsay, Shawn) Modified on 1/6/2023 to correct docket text list of filers(ecp).
January 6, 2023 Filing 58 Declaration of Gary Kleck . Filed by Cody Bowen, Damian Bunting, Harold Richard Haden, Jr, Adam Johnson, Brad Lohrey, Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc., Brian Pixley, Terry Rowan, Kevin Starrett, Brian Wolfe. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Joncus, Stephen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 57 Declaration of Clayton Cramer . Filed by Cody Bowen, Damian Bunting, Harold Richard Haden, Jr, Adam Johnson, Brad Lohrey, Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc., Brian Pixley, Terry Rowan, Kevin Starrett, Brian Wolfe. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Joncus, Stephen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 56 Declaration of Clayton Cramer . Filed by Cody Bowen, Damian Bunting, Harold Richard Haden, Jr, Adam Johnson, Brad Lohrey, Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc., Brian Pixley, Terry Rowan, Kevin Starrett, Brian Wolfe. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Joncus, Stephen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 55 Declaration of Massad Ayoob . Filed by Cody Bowen, Damian Bunting, Harold Richard Haden, Jr, Adam Johnson, Brad Lohrey, Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc., Brian Pixley, Terry Rowan, Kevin Starrett, Brian Wolfe. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Joncus, Stephen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 54 Declaration of Ashley Hlebinsky . Filed by Cody Bowen, Damian Bunting, Harold Richard Haden, Jr, Adam Johnson, Brad Lohrey, Oregon Firearms Federation, Inc., Brian Pixley, Terry Rowan, Kevin Starrett, Brian Wolfe. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Joncus, Stephen)
January 5, 2023 Filing 53 Certificate of Service by Katerina B Eyre, Tim Freeman, Mazama Sporting Goods, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Oregon State Shooting Association of Amended Complaint, (67 in 2:22-cv-01815-IM) re the Eyre Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Filed by Katerina B Eyre, Tim Freeman, Mazama Sporting Goods, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Oregon State Shooting Association.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Lindsay, Shawn)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Continue Postponement of Enforcement of Measure 114's Permitting Requirement, ECF #69 , is GRANTED. See attached Order for details. Signed on 1/5/2023 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
January 5, 2023 Filing 51 Motion to Continue Postponement of Enforcement of Measure 114's Permitting Requirement. Filed by All Defendants.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (Wilson, Harry)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: This Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Status Report, ECF #61 . In it, the parties agree that this Court's stay of the enforcement of Measure 114's permit-to-purchase requirement should be extended to 11:59 p.m. on 3/7/2023. In the Joint Status Report, the parties disagree as to the terms of that order and have each outlined their respective positions. Defendants are ORDERED to file a brief motion of a maximum of 5 pages by 10:00 a.m. on 1/5/2023 seeking any postponement or stay of Measure 114's provisions and clarifying which provisions they seek to postpone, and which provisions are not within the scope of their request. Defendants' motion must also specify the date to which Defendants seek to postpone implementation and the rationale for postponement. No response from Plaintiffs is needed. This Court will rule on any request for postponement by 5:00 p.m. on 1/5/2023.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
December 28, 2022 Filing 49 Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae. Filed by David Morello. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM (dino)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: This Court previously granted Defendant-Intervenor Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety's Motion to Intervene as Defendant in trailing case Eyre et al. v. Rosenblum, et al., No. 3:22-cv-01862-IM, ECF #35 . This Court notes that Defendant-Intervenor Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety's Motion was not accompanied by a proposed pleading, as set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(c). Defendant-Intervenor Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety has represented to this Court that Plaintiffs do not object to Defendant-Intervenor Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety filing its Answer at the same time as the State Defendants. Defendant-Intervenor Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint, ECF #1 , is therefore due 45 days after this Court issues its Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, as set forth in the parties' Proposed Briefing Schedule, ECF #61 , and adopted by this Court, ECF 63 . Ordered on 12/28/2022 by Judge Karin J. Immergut.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: This Court is in receipt of the parties' Proposed Scheduling Order included in their Joint Status Report, ECF #61 . This Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Oral argument is set for 2/22/2023, 2/23/2023, and 2/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 13A before Judge Karin J. Immergut. The hearing will be in-person but the Court will allow witnesses to appear remotely with seven days' notice to the Court and all parties. Ordered on 12/27/2022 by Judge Karin J. Immergut.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Per the parties' stipulated request included in their Joint Status Report, ECF #61 , this Court ORDERS that the following cases are consolidated: Oregon Firearms Federation et al. v. Brown et al., No. 2:22-cv-01815-IM; Fitz, et al. v. Rosenblum, et al., No. 3:22-cv-01859-IM; Eyre, et al. v. Rosenblum, et al., No. 3:22-cv-01862-IM; and Azzopardi, et al. v. Rosenblum, et al., No. 3:22-cv-01869-IM. The above-captioned case is designated as the lead case and with cases 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, and 3:22-cv-01869-IM designated as trailing cases. This Court ORDERS that future filings and other docket activities be filed on the above-captioned docket only, and that the case number and designation of the lead case be listed first in the document title of every document filed in any of these cases. Ordered on 12/27/2022 by Judge Karin J. Immergut.Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01815-IM, 3:22-cv-01859-IM, 3:22-cv-01862-IM, 3:22-cv-01869-IM (jy)
December 21, 2022 Filing 45 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding 43 Joint Status Report. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The entry was made in the incorrect case. The following corrections were made to the record: The entry has been sealed as an incorrect entry on the docket. (sb)
December 20, 2022 Filing 44 Exhibits Exhibits 2 & 3 to Joint Status Report re Joint Status Report #42 . Filed by Terri Davie, Ellen F Rosenblum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Hoffman, Hannah)
December 20, 2022 Filing 42 Joint Status Report . Filed by Terri Davie, Ellen F Rosenblum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hoffman, Hannah)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held on 12/15/2022 regarding the briefing schedule in this matter. Parties are ordered to confer and submit a Joint Status Report with a revised proposed briefing schedule by 12/20/2022 at 5 p.m. Ordered on 12/15/2022 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Matthew Rowen and Shawn M. Lindsay present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Brian Simmonds Marshall present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Karin J. Immergut presiding. (jy)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER This Court is in receipt of Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety's Motion to Intervene as Defendant, ECF #35 . This Court finds that Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety is not entitled to intervene as of right pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a). However, Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety may intervene permissively pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(b). Accordingly, Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety's Motion to Intervene as Defendant is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut on 12/15/2022. (jy)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #33 by attorney Scott Ferron. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #32 by attorney Kai Smith. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #31 by attorney Zachary J. Pekelis. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 14, 2022 Filing 36 Declaration of Thomas Wheatley . Filed by Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety. (Related document(s): Motion to intervene #35 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Skelton, Jessica)
December 14, 2022 Filing 35 Unopposed Motion to Intervene as a Defendant. Filed by Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety. (Skelton, Jessica)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Scheduling Order. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/15/2022 at 11:00AM in Portland Courtroom 13A before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 14, 2022 Filing 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Scott Ferron. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8756381. Filed by Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety. (Ferron, Scott)
December 14, 2022 Filing 32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kai Smith. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8756351. Filed by Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety. (Smith, Kai)
December 14, 2022 Filing 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Zachary J. Pekelis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8756322. Filed by Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety. (Pekelis, Zachary)
December 14, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Scott Ferron. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8756381 #33 , Zachary J. Pekelis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8756322 #31 , and Kai Smith. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8756351 #32 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
December 13, 2022 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance of Jessica A. Skelton appearing on behalf of Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety. Filed by on behalf of Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety. (Skelton, Jessica)
December 9, 2022 Filing 29 Joint Status Report by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants. (Wilson, Harry)
December 7, 2022 Filing 28 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lindsay, Shawn)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO"), ECF #5 , is DENIED. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Karin J. Immergut on 12/7/2022. (jy)
December 6, 2022 Filing 26 Stipulated Stipulation re Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law #5 by Terri Davie, Ellen F Rosenblum. Filed by Terri Davie, Ellen F Rosenblum. (Wilson, Harry)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #18 by attorney Nicholas M. Gallagher. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #16 by attorney Trever W. Ezell. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #15 by attorney Paul D. Clement. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #14 by attorney Matthew D. Rowen. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #13 by attorney Erin E. Murphy. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 5, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of Hannah Hoffman appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Hoffman, Hannah)
December 5, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorneys Erin E. Murphy, Matthew D. Rowen, Paul D. Clement, Trever W. Ezell and Nicholas M. Gallagher. Filing fees in the amount of $300 for each attorney collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8742417 #15 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
December 4, 2022 Filing 19 Notice Letter Filed by All Defendants. (Marshall, Brian)
December 2, 2022 Filing 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Nicholas M. Gallagher. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8742488. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Katerina B Eyre, Tim Freeman, Mazama Sporting Goods, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Oregon State Shooting Association. (Lindsay, Shawn) Modified on 12/5/2022 to correct counsel's name requesting Pro Hac Vice admission (ecp).
December 2, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement - Oregon State Shooting Association. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lindsay, Shawn)
December 2, 2022 Filing 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Trevor W. Ezell. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8742419. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Katerina B Eyre, Tim Freeman, Mazama Sporting Goods, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Oregon State Shooting Association. (Lindsay, Shawn) Modified on 12/5/2022 to correct counsel's name requesting Pro Hac Vice admission (ecp).
December 2, 2022 Filing 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Paul D. Clement. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8742417. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Katerina B Eyre, Tim Freeman, Mazama Sporting Goods, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Oregon State Shooting Association. (Lindsay, Shawn) Modified on 12/5/2022 to correct counsel's name requesting Pro Hac Vice admission (ecp).
December 2, 2022 Filing 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matthew D. Rowen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8742413. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Katerina B Eyre, Tim Freeman, Mazama Sporting Goods, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Oregon State Shooting Association. (Lindsay, Shawn) Modified on 12/5/2022 to correct counsel's name requesting Pro Hac Vice admission (ecp).
December 2, 2022 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Erin E. Murphy. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8742398. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Katerina B Eyre, Tim Freeman, Mazama Sporting Goods, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Oregon State Shooting Association. (Lindsay, Shawn) Modified on 12/5/2022 to correct counsel's name requesting Pro Hac Vice admission (ecp).
December 2, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement - National Shooting Sports Foundation. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lindsay, Shawn)
December 2, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement - Mazama Sporting Goods. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lindsay, Shawn)
December 2, 2022 Filing 10 Declaration of Jason Myers . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Lindsay, Shawn)
December 2, 2022 Filing 9 Declaration of Kevin L Campbell . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Lindsay, Shawn)
December 2, 2022 Filing 8 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held on 12/2/2022 regarding the briefing schedule in this matter. Any amicus briefs must be filed by noon on 12/5/2022 for consideration regarding a temporary restraining order. All future amicus briefs must be filed no later than seven days before any hearing in this matter. This Court reminds parties that the extent to which amicus briefs are considered is wholly within this Court's discretion. Shawn M. Lindsay present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Brian Simmonds Marshall and Harry B. Wilson present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Karin J. Immergut presiding. (jy)
December 1, 2022 Filing 7 Declaration of Matthew G. French . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Lindsay, Shawn)
December 1, 2022 Filing 6 Declaration of Adam Braatz . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Lindsay, Shawn)
December 1, 2022 Filing 5 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lindsay, Shawn)
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Harry B. Wilson appearing on behalf of Terri Davie, Ellen F Rosenblum. Filed by on behalf of Terri Davie, Ellen F Rosenblum. (Wilson, Harry)
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance of Brian Simmonds Marshall appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Marshall, Brian)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/31/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/1/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 5/1/2023. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp)
December 1, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8740349 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Katerina B Eyre, Mazama Sporting Goods, Tim Freeman, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lindsay, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eyre et al v. Rosenblum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katerina B Eyre
Represented By: Shawn M. Lindsay
Represented By: Trevor W. Ezell
Represented By: Matthew Rowen
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Represented By: Nicholas Gallagher
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Freeman
Represented By: Shawn M. Lindsay
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Represented By: Matthew Rowen
Represented By: Nicholas Gallagher
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Trevor W. Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazama Sporting Goods
Represented By: Shawn M. Lindsay
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Trevor W. Ezell
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Represented By: Matthew Rowen
Represented By: Nicholas Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn M. Lindsay
Represented By: Nicholas Gallagher
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Represented By: Matthew Rowen
Represented By: Trevor W. Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon State Shooting Association
Represented By: Shawn M. Lindsay
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Represented By: Matthew Rowen
Represented By: Nicholas Gallagher
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Trevor W. Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen F Rosenblum
Represented By: Brian Simmonds Marshall
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Hannah Hoffman
Represented By: Erin N. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Davie
Represented By: Brian Simmonds Marshall
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Hannah Hoffman
Represented By: Erin N. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Hunters Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Oregon Alliance for Gun Safety
Represented By: Jessica A. Skelton
Represented By: Zachary J. Pekelis
Represented By: Kai Smith
Represented By: Scott Ferron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Congressional Sportsmen's Foundation
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Rocky Mountain Elk Foundation
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sportsmen's Alliance Foundation
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oregon Wild Sheep Foundation
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Safari Club International
Represented By: Regina Lennox
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Deer Association
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Delta Waterfowl
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ducks Unlimited
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ducks Unlimited, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Operation Blazing Sword, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DC Project Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Pacific American Gun Owners Association
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National African American Gun Association, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?