Samuelson v. Jewell School District 8 et al
Defendant: Jewell School District No. 8, Jewell School District 8, Steve Phillips, Ron Brown, Jon Wood, Shannon Wood, Eric Dotson, Chance Moore, Tom Bergin, Brian Meier and John and Jane Doe 1-15
Petitioner: Dave Samuelson
Case Number: 3:2022cv01923
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Reply In Support of to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #9 . Filed by Tom Bergin, Eric Dotson, Chance Moore. (Campbell, Andrew)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #15 . Answer is due by 2/24/2023. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jp)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #9 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Parker, Robert)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Declaration of Katie Suver in Support of Defendant Brown's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Filed by Ron Brown. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #15 .) (Suver, Katie)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Ron Brown. (Suver, Katie)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Defendant Steve Phillips Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #11 . Answer is due by 2/15/2023. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jp)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #12 . Defendant Brian Meier's initial appearance is due by 2/20/2023. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jp)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Brian Meier. (Gordon, Noah)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Steve Phillips. (McKelvey, Lowell)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Declaration of Andrew D. Campbell . Filed by Tom Bergin, Eric Dotson, Chance Moore. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #9 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Campbell, Andrew)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by Eric Dotson, Chance Moore, Tom Bergin. (Campbell, Andrew)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Defendants Jewell School District, Jon Wood and Shannon Wood's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, ECF #7 . Answer or other responsive pleading is due by February 15, 2023. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Jon Wood, Shannon Wood, Jewell School District 8. (Vickers, Karen)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Defendants' Eric Dotson, Chance Moore, Tom Bergin's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, ECF #5 . Defendants Eric Dotson, Chance Moore, Tom Bergin's answer or other response is due by February 15, 2023. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Eric Dotson, Chance Moore, Tom Bergin. (Campbell, Andrew)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Tom Bergin, Ron Brown, Eric Dotson, Jewell School District 8, Brian Meier, Chance Moore, Steve Phillips, Jon Wood, Shannon Wood. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kgc)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons) Filed by Dave Samuelson. (Parker, Robert)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/12/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/12/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 5/12/2023. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (dino)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8753608 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Dave Samuelson against Jewell School District No. 8 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Parker, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuelson v. Jewell School District 8 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dave Samuelson
Represented By: Robert Roosevelt Parker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewell School District No. 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewell School District 8
Represented By: Beth Plass
Represented By: Karen M. Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Phillips
Represented By: Lowell P. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Brown
Represented By: Dirk L. Pierson
Represented By: Katie Suver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Wood
Represented By: Karen M. Vickers
Represented By: Beth Plass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Wood
Represented By: Beth Plass
Represented By: Karen M. Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Dotson
Represented By: Andrew D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chance Moore
Represented By: Andrew D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Bergin
Represented By: Andrew D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Meier
Represented By: Noah Jacob Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?