cPanel, LLC v. Does 1-10
Plaintiff: cPanel, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2022cv01963
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ISSUING PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY ORDER: This Court DENIES Plaintiff's renewed ex parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order with leave to renew with notice to Defendants or should circumstances change such that an ex parte temporary restraining order becomes appropriate during expedited discovery. Finding good cause, this Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to conduct expedited discovery as to the third parties and topics set forth the attached Order. Further, this Court ORDERS Plaintiff to submit a status report regarding the status of its third-party discovery efforts by 3/7/2023. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut on 2/14/2023. (jy)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Attorney Kimberlee Gunning Filed by cPanel, LLC. (Gunning, Kimberlee)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Declaration of Venkat Balasubramani . Filed by cPanel, LLC. (Related document(s): Supplement, #15 .) (Balasubramani, Venkat)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Supplement Supplemental Brief. Filed by cPanel, LLC. (Related document(s): Order on motion for Temporary Restraining Order,,,,,,, Status Conference,,,,,, 13 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Supplemental Brief, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Balasubramani, Venkat)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Ashley J. McDonald appearing on behalf of cPanel, LLC. Filed by on behalf of cPanel, LLC. (McDonald, Ashley)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES of Proceedings and ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: Plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Expedited Discovery, ECF #7 . This Court held a Telephonic Status Conference regarding this motion on 1/11/2023 at 2:00 PM. As stated on the record, this Court finds that Plaintiffs is not entitled to an ex parte hearing on the TRO and therefore this Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order with leave to renew with notice to Defendants. Finding good cause, this Court GRANTS Plaintiff's (Ex Parte) Motion for Expedited Discovery to determine the identity of the Doe defendants and for information relevant to the request for pretrial injunctive relief. This Court ORDERS Plaintiff to submit supplemental briefing, along with a proposed expedited discovery order narrowly tailored to identifying Doe Defendants and obtaining information relevant to the request for pretrial injunctive relief. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to identify a limited number of persons or entities on whom discovery process might be served and for which there is a reasonable likelihood that the discovery process will lead to identifying information about the Doe defendants that would make service of process possible. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut on 1/11/2023. Kimberlee Gunning and Venkat Balasubramani present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Karin J. Immergut presiding. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (jy)
January 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Scheduling Order. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/11/2023 at 2:00PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Declaration of Kimberlee Gunning . Filed by cPanel, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Balasubramani, Venkat)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Declaration of Michael Jaczewski . Filed by cPanel, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Balasubramani, Venkat)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Declaration of Jesse Asklund . Filed by cPanel, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Balasubramani, Venkat)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Declaration of John Lightsey . Filed by cPanel, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Balasubramani, Venkat)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Expedited Discovery. Filed by cPanel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Balasubramani, Venkat)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 by attorney Kimberlee Gunning. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (ecp)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kimberlee Gunning. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8764072. Filed by cPanel, LLC. (Gunning, Kimberlee)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/20/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/22/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 5/22/2023. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by cPanel, LLC. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8762975 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by cPanel, LLC against Does 1-10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit copyright registration certs, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Form AO 121 (copyright), #4 Attachment Form AO 120 (trademark)). (Balasubramani, Venkat)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kimberlee Gunning. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8764072 #4 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: cPanel, LLC v. Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: cPanel, LLC
Represented By: Kimberlee Gunning
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Represented By: Ashley J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?