Columbia Sportswear Company et al v. Barefoot Creations LLC
Plaintiff: Columbia Sportswear Company, Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. and Columbia Brands USA, LLC
Defendant: Barefoot Creations LLC an Oregon limited liability company doing business as Softstar Shoes
Case Number: 3:2023cv00668
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #13 . Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 7/21/2023. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (dsg)
June 26, 2023 Filing 14 Declaration of Lake Perriguey . Filed by Barefoot Creations LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #13 .) (Perriguey, Lake James)
June 26, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Barefoot Creations LLC. (Perriguey, Lake James)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #9 . Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 7/3/2023. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mja)
May 25, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Barefoot Creations LLC. (Perriguey, Lake James)
May 25, 2023 Filing 10 Declaration of Lake Perriguey in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Barefoot Creations LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #9 .) (Perriguey, Lake James)
May 25, 2023 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Barefoot Creations LLC. (Perriguey, Lake James)
May 12, 2023 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #5 upon Barefoot Creations LLC served on 5/9/2023, answer due on 5/30/2023 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
May 9, 2023 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office regarding Trademark Report #6 and Report #2 . (sb)
May 9, 2023 Filing 6 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (sb)
May 5, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Barefoot Creations LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/5/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/2/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 10/2/2023. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sb)
May 5, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Columbia Brands USA, LLC, Columbia Sportswear Company, Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
May 5, 2023 Filing 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. Filed by Columbia Brands USA, LLC, Columbia Sportswear Company, Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
May 5, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. for Trademark Infringement, False Designation of Origin, and Unfair Competition Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8923883 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 3894351--12/21/2010--Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc., 4296505--2/26/2013--Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc., 2480957--8/21/2001--Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc., 3878153--11/16/2010--Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc., 4070939--12/13/2011--Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. Filed by Columbia Brands USA, LLC, Columbia Sportswear Company, Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. against Barefoot Creations LLC dba Softstar Shoes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Aldrich, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Sportswear Company et al v. Barefoot Creations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Sportswear Company
Represented By: Michael A. Cohen
Represented By: Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Cohen
Represented By: Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Brands USA, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Cohen
Represented By: Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barefoot Creations LLC an Oregon limited liability company doing business as Softstar Shoes
Represented By: Lake James H. Perriguey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?