Schoene v. Christensen et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Schoene and Kimberly M. Schoene
Defendant: Penelope Christensen and Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope
Case Number: 3:2023cv00693
Filed: May 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Adrienne Nelson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Declaration of Penelope Christensen . Filed by Penelope Christensen, Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #18 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Barhoum, John)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Penelope Christensen, Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope. (Barhoum, John)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 . Filed by Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope, Penelope Christensen. (Barhoum, John)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope. (Barhoum, John)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, ECF #13 , is GRANTED. Defendants' response to the complaint is now due July 5, 2023. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 6/12/2023.) (joha)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Declaration of John Barhoum ISO MOET Answer to Complaint. Filed by Penelope Christensen, Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #13 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Barhoum, John)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #1 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope, Penelope Christensen. (Barhoum, John)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF #10 , is GRANTED. Defendants' response to the motion for preliminary injunction is now due July 5, 2023. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 6/7/2023.) (joha)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Declaration of John Barhoum In Support of Motion for Extension of time to respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Penelope Christensen, Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Motion for Preliminary Injunction #10 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 .) (Barhoum, John) Modified on 6/5/2023 to correct document link and docket text (dino).
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope, Penelope Christensen. (Barhoum, John) Modified on 6/5/2023 to correct document link and docket text (dino).
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Penelope Christensen served on 5/13/2023, answer due on 6/5/2023; Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope served on 5/13/2023, answer due on 6/5/2023. (ecp)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Adrienne Nelson and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/11/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/10/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 10/10/2023. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/12/2023.) (ecp)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Penelope Christensen, Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/11/2023.) (ecp)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certificate of Compliance. Filed by Kimberly Schoene. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 .) (ecp)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Form of Order Submitted. Filed by Kimberly Schoene. (ecp)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Declaration of Kimberly Schoene. Filed by Kimberly Schoene. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 .) (ecp)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Kimberly Schoene. (ecp)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Receipt No. 102605. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kimberly Schoene against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (ecp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoene v. Christensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Schoene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly M. Schoene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penelope Christensen
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Hair Extensions By Penelope
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?