Benoit v. Grasley et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Benoit
Defendant: Andrew Grasley, Megan Heidt, Integrated Medical Solutions LLC, Federal Bureau of Prisons, United States of America and Integrated Medical Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00903
Filed: June 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by Integrated Medical Solutions LLC. (Viteznik, Peter)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendant Integrated Medical Solutions' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #4 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 8/8/2023 for Defendant Integrated Medical Solutions, LLC. (gm)
July 12, 2023 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time FOR DEFENDANT INTEGRATED MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Filed by Integrated Medical Solutions LLC. (Viteznik, Peter)
June 23, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/23/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/20/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 11/20/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp)
June 21, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8987933 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Cynthia Benoit against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Lo, Viktoria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benoit v. Grasley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Benoit
Represented By: Noah A.F. Horst
Represented By: Viktoria Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Grasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Heidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Medical Solutions LLC
Represented By: Donald Kolb
Represented By: Peter J. Viteznik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Medical Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Kolb
Represented By: Peter J. Viteznik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?