County of Multnomah v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Plaintiff: County of Multnomah
Defendant: Shell PLC, Occidental Petroleum, Totalenergies Marketing USA, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Royal Dutch Shell plc, Shell USA, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products US, BP PLC, BP America, Inc., BP Products North America Inc., Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc., ConocoPhillips, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Space Age Fuel, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Total SA, Total Specialties USA Inc., Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corp., Marathon Petroleum Corp., Peabody Energy Corp., Koch Industries Inc., American Petroleum Institute, Western States Petroleum Association, McKinsey and Company, Inc., McKinsey Holdings Inc. and Does 1-250 Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2023cv01213
Filed: August 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Real Property Property Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Filing 112 Letter Regarding Matter of Recusal. Signed on 10/11/2023 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 4, 2023 Filing 111 Corporate Disclosure Statement (TotalEnergies Marketing USA f/k/a Total Specialties USA, Inc.). Filed by Totalenergies Marketing USA. (Stump, Joshua)
October 4, 2023 Filing 110 Corporate Disclosure Statement (TotalEnergies SE f/k/a Total S.A.). Filed by Totalenergies Marketing USA. (Stump, Joshua)
October 4, 2023 Filing 109 Notice of Appearance of Joshua P. Stump appearing on behalf of Totalenergies Marketing USA. Filed by on behalf of Totalenergies Marketing USA. (Stump, Joshua)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #105 requested by Attorney JoDee L. Neil. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pjg)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David C Greenstone #104 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pjg)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shreedhar Rajnikant Patel #103 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pjg)
October 4, 2023 Filing 105 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney JoDee L. Neil. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9104840. Filed by County of Multnomah. (Neil, JoDee)
October 4, 2023 Filing 104 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David C Greenstone. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9104839. Filed by County of Multnomah. (Greenstone, David)
October 4, 2023 Filing 103 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Shreedhar Rajnikant Patel. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9104837. Filed by County of Multnomah. (Patel, Shreedhar)
October 4, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney JoDee L. Neil. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9104840 #105 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
October 4, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David C Greenstone. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9104839 #104 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
October 4, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Shreedhar Rajnikant Patel. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9104837 #103 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino) Modified on 10/4/2023 to correct file date (dino).
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: Granting attorney Dennis Howe's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #97 , for Defendants Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell PLC, and Shell USA, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9102532. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 3, 2023 Filing 101 Verified Motion for Leave TO APPEAR PRO HACE VICE. Filed by County of Multnomah. (Neil, JoDee)
October 3, 2023 Filing 100 Verified Motion for Leave TO APPEAR PRO HACE VICE. Filed by County of Multnomah. (Greenstone, David)
October 3, 2023 Filing 99 Verified Motion for Leave TO APPEAR PRO HACE VICE. Filed by County of Multnomah. (Patel, Shreedhar)
October 2, 2023 Filing 98 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by County of Multnomah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Coon, James)
October 2, 2023 Filing 97 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Dennis Howe. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9102532. Filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell PLC, Shell USA, Inc.. (Howe, Dennis)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: Granting attorney Brian David Schmalzbach's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #92 , for Defendant American Petroleum Institute; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9100852. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: Granting attorney Jeremiah J. Anderson's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #91 , for Defendant American Petroleum Institute; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9100824. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: Granting attorney Matthew Johnson's Motion for Leave Pro Hac Vice #90 , for Defendant Valero Energy Corporation; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9099486. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: Granting attorney James F. Bennett's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #89 , for Defendant Valero Energy Corporation; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9099479. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 2, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jeremiah J. Anderson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9100824 #91 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
October 2, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brian David Schmalzbach. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9100852 #92 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
October 2, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Dennis Howe. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9102532 #97 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 29, 2023 Filing 92 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brian David Schmalzbach. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9100852. Filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Schmalzbach, Brian)
September 29, 2023 Filing 91 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jeremiah J. Anderson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9100824. Filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Anderson, Jeremiah)
September 28, 2023 Filing 90 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matthew Johnson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9099486. Filed by Valero Energy Corporation. (Johnson, Matthew)
September 28, 2023 Filing 89 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James F. Bennett. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9099479. Filed by Valero Energy Corporation. (Bennett, James)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: Granting attorney Ann Marie Mortimer's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #82 , Marathon Petroleum Corp.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9098518. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: Granting attorney Cassandra C. Collins's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #81 , for Defendant Marathon Petroleum Corp.; AORDC-9097780. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Granting attorney Shawn Patrick Regan's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #80 , for Defendant Marathon Petroleum Corp.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9097860. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: Granting attorney Shannon S. Broome's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #79 , for Defendant Marathon Petroleum Corp.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9097781. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 28, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matthew Johnson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9099486 #90 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 28, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James F. Bennett. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9099479 #89 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 27, 2023 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Wylie, Patrick)
September 27, 2023 Filing 83 Notice of Appearance of Matthew R. Wiese, Patrick C. Wylie appearing on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corp.. Filed by on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Wiese, Matthew)
September 27, 2023 Filing 82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ann Marie Mortimer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9098518. Filed by Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
September 27, 2023 Filing 81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Cassandra C. Collins. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9097780. Filed by on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corp. (dino)
September 27, 2023 Filing 80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Shawn Patrick Regan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9097860. Filed by Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Regan, Shawn)
September 27, 2023 Filing 79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Shannon S. Broome. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9097781. Filed by Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Broome, Shannon)
September 27, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Shannon S. Broome. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9097781 #79 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 27, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Shawn Patrick Regan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9097860 #80 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 27, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Cassandra C. Collins. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: AORDC-9097780 #81 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: Granting attorney Oliver Peter Thoma's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #77 for Defendant Motiva Enterprises LLC; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9094665. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 25, 2023 Filing 77 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Oliver Peter Thoma. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9094665. Filed by Motiva Enterprises LLC. (Thoma, Oliver)
September 25, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Oliver Peter Thoma. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9094665 #77 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 21, 2023 Filing 76 Notice of Appearance of Aukjen Ingraham appearing on behalf of Motiva Enterprises LLC. Filed by on behalf of Motiva Enterprises LLC. (Ingraham, Aukjen)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: Granting attorney Daniel Severson's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #72 , for Defendants Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell PLC, Shell USA, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9090541. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Granting attorney David C. Frederick's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #71 , for Defendants Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell PLC, Shell USA, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9090540. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: Granting attorney James M. Webster, III's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #70 , for Defendants Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell PLC, Shell USA, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9090531. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 21, 2023 Filing 72 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel Severson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9090541. Filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell PLC, Shell USA, Inc.. (Severson, Daniel)
September 21, 2023 Filing 71 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David C. Frederick. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9090540. Filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell PLC, Shell USA, Inc.. (Frederick, David)
September 21, 2023 Filing 70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James M. Webster, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9090531. Filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell PLC, Shell USA, Inc.. (Webster, James)
September 21, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel Severson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9090541 #72 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 21, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James M. Webster, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9090531 #70 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 21, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David C. Frederick. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9090540 #71 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 20, 2023 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Motiva Enterprises LLC. (Anderson, David)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: Granting attorney Erica W. Harris's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #66 , for Defendants Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084684. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Granting attorney Caitlin Grusauskas's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #62 , for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084462. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 15, 2023 Filing 66 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Erica W. Harris. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084684. Filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Harris, Erica)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: Granting attorney Yahonnes Cleary's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #61 , for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084443. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: Granting attorney Daniel J. Toal's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #60 , for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084432. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Granting attorney Theodore V. Wells, Jr.'s Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #59 , for Defendant by Exxon Mobil Corporation; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084420. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 15, 2023 Filing 62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Caitlin Grusauskas. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084462. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Grusauskas, Caitlin)
September 15, 2023 Filing 61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Yahonnes Cleary. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084443. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Cleary, Yahonnes)
September 15, 2023 Filing 60 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel J. Toal. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084432. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Toal, Daniel)
September 15, 2023 Filing 59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Theodore V. Wells, Jr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084420. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Wells, Theodore)
September 15, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel J. Toal. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084432 #60 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 15, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Theodore V. Wells, Jr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084420 #59 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 15, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Yahonnes Cleary. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084443 #61 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 15, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Erica W. Harris. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084684 #66 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 15, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Caitlin Grusauskas. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9084462 #62 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 13, 2023 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement of BP America Inc.. Filed by BP America, Inc., BP PLC, BP Products North America Inc.. (Lombardo, John)
September 13, 2023 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement of BP Products North America Inc.. Filed by BP America, Inc., BP PLC, BP Products North America Inc.. (Lombardo, John)
September 13, 2023 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement of BP p.l.c.. Filed by BP America, Inc., BP PLC, BP Products North America Inc.. (Lombardo, John)
September 13, 2023 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by McKinsey and Company, Inc.. (Davidson, Clifford)
September 13, 2023 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by McKinsey Holdings Inc.. (Davidson, Clifford)
September 13, 2023 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corp.. (French, Pilar)
September 12, 2023 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance of Scott L. Jensen appearing on behalf of Space Age Fuel, Inc.. Filed by on behalf of Space Age Fuel, Inc.. (Jensen, Scott)
September 12, 2023 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Clifford, Dwain)
September 12, 2023 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Space Age Fuel, Inc.. (Cadonau, Cary)
September 12, 2023 Filing 49 Notice of Appearance of Cary R. Cadonau appearing on behalf of Space Age Fuel, Inc.. Filed by on behalf of Space Age Fuel, Inc.. (Cadonau, Cary)
September 11, 2023 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell PLC, Shell USA, Inc.. (White, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2023 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance of Elizabeth H. White appearing on behalf of Shell USA, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell PLC. Filed by on behalf of Shell USA, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell PLC. (White, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: The parties have conferred and provided the court with a proposal for how defendants should submit responses to plaintiff's motion for remand. The court orders as follows: Defendants shall coordinate their efforts to file a single Joint Opposition to plaintiff's Motion to Remand that will address all common issues and will not exceed 45 pages, excluding any exhibits and other supporting materials. If any defendant believes it necessary to file a separate brief to address issues that are specific to that individual defendant, it shall request permission from the court in advance and explain why separate briefing is necessary. Any separate briefs, if allowed, shall be limited to 15 pages, excluding any exhibits and other supporting materials. If separate briefing is allowed, it shall not be duplicative of the joint brief. The word limitations under LR 7-2 will not apply in light of the page limits set forth in this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Granting attorney Nancy G Milburn's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #41 , for Defendants BP America, Inc., BP PLC, and BP Products North America Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076725. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Granting attorney Diana Reiter's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #40 , for Defendants BP America, Inc., BP PLC, and BP Products North America Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076701. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Granting attorney John D. Lombardo's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #39 , for Defendants BP America, Inc., BP PLC, and BP Products North America Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076690. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Granting attorney Jonathan W. Hughes's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #38 , for Defendants BP PLC, BP America, Inc., and BP Products North America Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076612. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 8, 2023 Filing 41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Nancy G Milburn. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076725. Filed by BP America, Inc., BP PLC, BP Products North America Inc.. (Milburn, Nancy)
September 8, 2023 Filing 40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Diana Reiter. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076701. Filed by BP America, Inc., BP PLC, BP Products North America Inc.. (Reiter, Diana)
September 8, 2023 Filing 39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney John D. Lombardo. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076690. Filed by BP America, Inc., BP PLC, BP Products North America Inc.. (Lombardo, John)
September 8, 2023 Filing 38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jonathan W. Hughes. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076612. Filed by BP America, Inc., BP PLC, BP Products North America Inc.. (Hughes, Jonathan)
September 8, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney John D. Lombardo. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076690 #39 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 8, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jonathan W. Hughes. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076612 #38 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 8, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Diana Reiter. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076701 #40 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 8, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Nancy G Milburn. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076725 #41 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 7, 2023 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance of Ryan T. O'Hollaren appearing on behalf of Marathon Oil Corp., Marathon Oil Company. Filed by on behalf of Marathon Oil Corp., Marathon Oil Company. (O'Hollaren, Ryan)
September 7, 2023 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance of Pilar C. French appearing on behalf of Marathon Oil Corp., Marathon Oil Company. Filed by on behalf of Marathon Oil Corp., Marathon Oil Company. (French, Pilar)
September 6, 2023 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance of Brad S. Daniels appearing on behalf of BP America, Inc., BP Products North America Inc., BP PLC. Filed by on behalf of BP America, Inc., BP Products North America Inc., BP PLC. (Daniels, Brad)
September 6, 2023 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Western States Petroleum Association. (Hovda, Kc)
September 6, 2023 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Winters, Evelyn)
September 5, 2023 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance of Evelyn English Winters appearing on behalf of American Petroleum Institute. Filed by on behalf of American Petroleum Institute. (Winters, Evelyn)
September 1, 2023 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance of Christopher John Riley appearing on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. Filed by on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. (Riley, Christopher)
September 1, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance of Kc Lynne Hovda appearing on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. Filed by on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. (Hovda, Kc)
September 1, 2023 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance of Joshua M. Sasaki appearing on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. Filed by on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. (Sasaki, Joshua)
August 30, 2023 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by ConocoPhillips. (Estok, Michael)
August 30, 2023 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance of Michael J. Estok appearing on behalf of ConocoPhillips. Filed by on behalf of ConocoPhillips. (Estok, Michael)
August 30, 2023 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Valero Energy Corporation. (Pitzer, Jeff)
August 30, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance of Peter M. Grabiel appearing on behalf of Valero Energy Corporation. Filed by on behalf of Valero Energy Corporation. (Grabiel, Peter)
August 30, 2023 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance of Jeff S. Pitzer appearing on behalf of Valero Energy Corporation. Filed by on behalf of Valero Energy Corporation. (Pitzer, Jeff)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Granting attorney William Edward Thomson's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #19 , for Defendants Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A., Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064950. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Granting attorney Thomas G. Hungar's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #18 , for Defendants Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A., Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064936. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting attorney Andrea Ellen Neuman's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #17 , for Defendants Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A., Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064915. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting attorney Duke K. McCall, III's, Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #16 for Defendant Occidental Petroleum Corporation. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064751. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 30, 2023 Filing 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney William Edward Thomson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064950. Filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Thomson, William)
August 30, 2023 Filing 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Thomas G. Hungar. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064936. Filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Hungar, Thomas)
August 30, 2023 Filing 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrea Ellen Neuman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064915. Filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Neuman, Andrea)
August 30, 2023 Filing 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Duke K. McCall, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064751. Filed by Occidental Petroleum. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (McCall, Duke)
August 30, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrea Ellen Neuman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064915 #17 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
August 30, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Duke K. McCall, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064751 #16 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
August 30, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Thomas G. Hungar. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064936 #18 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
August 30, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney William Edward Thomson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9064950 #19 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
August 29, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Occidental Petroleum. (Hoesly, Cody)
August 29, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Dwain M. Clifford appearing on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation. Filed by on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Clifford, Dwain)
August 29, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance of James T. McDermott appearing on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation. Filed by on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation. (McDermott, James)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.'s Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 for defendants Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A., Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9057244. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting attorney Joshua D. Dick's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 for defendants Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A., Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-9057198. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 24, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Joshua D. Dick. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-9057198 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
August 24, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9057244 #10 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
August 23, 2023 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9057244. Filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore)
August 23, 2023 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Joshua D. Dick. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-9057198. Filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Dick, Joshua)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #7 is granted. The deadline for defendants to file responsive pleadings is stayed pending resolution of plaintiff's forthcoming motion to remand. Plaintiff's motion to remand shall be filed by October 2, 2023, defendants' responses are due November 16, 2023, and plaintiff's reply is due December 13, 2023. By September 8, 2023, the parties shall confer and file a written proposal regarding how the 25 defendants will submit their responses to the motion to remand so that the briefing is not redundant and promotes judicial efficiency. If plaintiff's motion to remand is denied, defendants' motions to dismiss and anti-SLAPP motions shall be filed 45 days after the court issues its final order on plaintiff's motion to remand. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 22, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time and to Set Briefing Schedule. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee)
August 22, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Mackenzie E. L. Wong appearing on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc., Mckinsey Holdings Inc.. Filed by on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc., Mckinsey Holdings Inc.. (Wong, Mackenzie)
August 22, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Clifford S. Davidson appearing on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc., Mckinsey Holdings Inc.. Filed by on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc., Mckinsey Holdings Inc.. (Davidson, Clifford)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/19/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/18/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
August 18, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee)
August 18, 2023 Filing 2 Declaration of Joshua D. Dick In Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Original & First Amended Complaint_Part1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2 - Wilson Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 3 - 1974.1210 Comprehensive Energy Plan, #5 Exhibit 4 - 214 2020.05.29 A Word about Fuels, #6 Exhibit 5 -156 2020 Navy Supply Corps Newsletter Spring 2020, #7 Exhibit 6 -Pedlow & Welzenbach, The CIA & Overhead Reconnaissance, #8 Exhibit 7 - 1981.07.29 CIA Doc. No. CIA-RDP90B00170R000100080001-5., #9 Exhibit 8 - 092 1994 Rich, Lockheed Skunk Works, #10 Exhibit 9 - 093 1962.08.14 CIA Doc No. CIA-RDP67B00074R000500400016-2, Contract No. AF33(657)-8577 (SH-511), #11 Exhibit 10 - 094 1963.08.26 CIA-RDP67B00074R000500400012-6, #12 Exhibit 11 - 095 1963.09.20 CIA-RDP67B00074R000500440005-0, #13 Exhibit 12 - 096 1964.06.30 CIA RDP6, #14 Exhibit 13 - -097 1963.09.20 CIA-RDP67B00074R000500440006-9, #15 Exhibit 14 - 098 1963.06.28 CIA-RDP67B00074R000500430003-3, #16 Exhibit 15 - 099 1963.02.25 CIA-RDP67B00074R000500420006-1, #17 Exhibit 16 - 100 1962.09.13 CIA-RDP67B00074R000500410006-2, #18 Exhibit 17 - 101 1963.08.23 CIA-RDP63-00313A000500130031-9, #19 Exhibit 18 - 158 2009.07.27 SP060010R0061 and Addendum, #20 Exhibit 19 - 159 2011.12.12 SP060012R0061 and Addendum, #21 Exhibit 20 - 146 Procurement Contract SP060012D0510, #22 Exhibit 21 - 147 Procurement Contract SP060012D0498, #23 Exhibit 22 - 148 Procurement Contract 375 Ex. 32_SP060010D0470, #24 Exhibit 23 - 149 Procurement Contract SP060011D0482, #25 Exhibit 24 - 150 2012.10.11 Summary of Award (F76, JAA, JP5, JP8), #26 Exhibit 25 - 151 2012.10.11 Minimum Cost Solution Bid Award Shee, #27 Exhibit 26 - -152 2010.07.22 Solicitation Award Report, #28 Exhibit 27 - 102 1999.04.01 Detail Specification Turbine Fuels, Aviation, Kerosene Types, #29 Exhibit 28 - 153 2004.01.05 Detail Specification for JP-5, #30 Exhibit 29 - 135_Contract Summary Tables, #31 Exhibit 30 - 118 2014.08.00 DOD Handbook EXCERPT, #32 Exhibit 31 --136 1987.11.00 Military Jet Fuels 1944-87 AFWAL-TR-87-2062, #33 Exhibit 32 - 190 1945.11.28 Statement of Ralph K. Davies, #34 Exhibit 33 - 169 1949.00.00 National Petroleum Council Policy, #35 Exhibit 34 - 133 1945.11.28 Statement of Senator Joseph C. O'Mahoney_S. Res. 36, #36 Exhibit 35 - 174 1945.11.28 Wilson Statement_S. Res. 36 (1945), #37 Exhibit 36 - -083 1946.00.00 Frey History of the Petroleum Administration for War 1941-1945, #38 Exhibit 37 - -111 1941.08.11 Ickes Davis Speech Transcript of Meeting (excerpt), #39 Exhibit 38 - 107 1942.08.12; Discipline for Non-Compliant Refiners, #40 Exhibit 39 -131 DLA Energy Fiscal Year 2019 Fact Book, #41 Exhibit 40 - 132 2020.11.23 Brief of General Myers and Admiral Mullen) (Rothauge, Renee)
August 18, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 23CV25164 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9052674 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Rothauge, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Multnomah v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell PLC
Represented By: James M. Webster, III
Represented By: Elizabeth H. White
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Dennis Howe
Represented By: Daniel Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Petroleum
Represented By: Duke K. McCall, III
Represented By: Cody B. Hoesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Totalenergies Marketing USA
Represented By: Joshua P. Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: James T. McDermott
Represented By: Caitlin Grusauskas
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Yahonnes Cleary
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal
Represented By: Dwain M. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Dutch Shell plc
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Elizabeth H. White
Represented By: Daniel Severson
Represented By: Dennis Howe
Represented By: James M. Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Howe
Represented By: James M. Webster, III
Represented By: Elizabeth H. White
Represented By: Daniel Severson
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products US
Represented By: Elizabeth H. White
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Daniel Severson
Represented By: Dennis Howe
Represented By: James M. Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP PLC
Represented By: Diana Reiter
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America, Inc.
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Diana Reiter
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc.
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Diana Reiter
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corp.
Represented By: Julia E. Markley
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Represented By: Andrea Ellen Neuman
Represented By: Erica W. Harris
Represented By: Joshua D. Dick
Represented By: Thomas G. Hungar
Represented By: William Edward Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA Inc.
Represented By: Julia E. Markley
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Ellen Neuman
Represented By: Erica W. Harris
Represented By: Joshua D. Dick
Represented By: Thomas G. Hungar
Represented By: William Edward Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Represented By: Michael J. Estok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Aukjen Ingraham
Represented By: Oliver Peter Thoma
Represented By: David Arden Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Corp.
Represented By: Duke K. McCall, III
Represented By: Cody B. Hoesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Space Age Fuel, Inc.
Represented By: Scott L. Jensen
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jeff S. Pitzer
Represented By: Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Peter M. Grabiel
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total SA
Represented By: Joshua P. Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Specialties USA Inc.
Represented By: Joshua P. Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Represented By: Pilar C. French
Represented By: Ryan Thomas O'Hollaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Corp.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas O'Hollaren
Represented By: Pilar C. French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corp.
Represented By: Patrick C. Wylie
Represented By: Cassandra C. Collins
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Regan
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Represented By: Shannon S. Broome
Represented By: Matthew R. Wiese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peabody Energy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Evelyn English Winters
Represented By: Brian David Schmalzbach
Represented By: Jeremiah J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western States Petroleum Association
Represented By: Christopher John Riley
Represented By: Joshua M. Sasaki
Represented By: Kc Lynne Hovda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Represented By: Mackenzie E. L. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Represented By: Mackenzie E. L. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-250 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Multnomah
Represented By: JoDee L. Neil
Represented By: Shreedhar Rajnikant Patel
Represented By: James S. Coon
Represented By: Raymond F. Thomas
Represented By: David C Greenstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?