AirWair International Ltd. et al v. Steven Madden LTD. et al
Plaintiff: AirWair International Ltd. and Dr. Martens AirWair USA, LLC
Defendant: Steven Madden LTD., CP International Corp. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 3:2023cv01227
Filed: August 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Adrienne Nelson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of Timothy W. Snider, Nathan C. Brunette appearing on behalf of Steven Madden LTD.. Filed by on behalf of Steven Madden LTD.. (Snider, Timothy)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 ; Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 ; Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 ; Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 . Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
September 8, 2023 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Courtney Thompson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076307. Filed by AirWair International Ltd.. (Thompson, Courtney)
September 8, 2023 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Sebastian Kaplan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076287. Filed by AirWair International Ltd.. (Kaplan, Sebastian)
September 8, 2023 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kenneth Lee Marshall. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076228. Filed by AirWair International Ltd.. (Marshall, Kenneth)
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Alexandra Whitworth. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076194. Filed by AirWair International Ltd.. (Whitworth, Alexandra)
September 8, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Courtney Thompson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076307 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 8, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Sebastian Kaplan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076287 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 8, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Alexandra Whitworth. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076194 #6 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 8, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kenneth Lee Marshall. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9076228 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
August 23, 2023 Filing 5 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (ecp)
August 23, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to CP International Corp., Steven Madden LTD.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 issued summons) (ecp)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Adrienne Nelson and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/21/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/22/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 1/22/2024. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (ecp)
August 23, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by AirWair International Ltd., Dr. Martens AirWair USA, LLC. (Campbell, Jennifer)
August 23, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. for Trademark Infringement Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9057041 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 2,437,751--3/27/2001--AirWair International Ltd., 5,067,692--10/27/2016--AirWair International Ltd., 7,039,347--5/2/2023--AirWair International Ltd., 7,039,348--5/2/2023--AirWair International Ltd.. Filed by AirWair International Ltd., Dr. Martens AirWair USA, LLC against CP International Corp., Does 1-50, Steven Madden LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Campbell, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AirWair International Ltd. et al v. Steven Madden LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AirWair International Ltd.
Represented By: Allison K. Krashan
Represented By: Jennifer L. Campbell
Represented By: Courtney Thompson
Represented By: Alexandra Whitworth
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Marshall
Represented By: Sebastian Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Martens AirWair USA, LLC
Represented By: Allison K. Krashan
Represented By: Jennifer L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Madden LTD.
Represented By: Nathan C. Brunette
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CP International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?