Andrews v. White Line Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kody Andrews
Defendant: White Line Systems, LLC, Driven 2 Drive Leasing, LLC and Rick Allred Systems Inc. doing business as Allred Systems
Case Number: 3:2023cv01258
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act - Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Driven 2 Drive Leasing, LLC. (McCracken, Christopher)
October 20, 2023 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Rick Allred Systems Inc.. (McCracken, Christopher)
October 20, 2023 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by White Line Systems, LLC. (McCracken, Christopher)
October 20, 2023 Filing 22 Answer to #1 Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Driven 2 Drive Leasing, LLC, White Line Systems, LLC, Rick Allred Systems Inc.. (McCracken, Christopher)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, ECF #20 . Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is due by October 20, 2023. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 20, 2023 Filing 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #1 . Filed by Driven 2 Drive Leasing, LLC, White Line Systems, LLC, Rick Allred Systems Inc.. (McCracken, Christopher)
September 19, 2023 Filing 19 Second Return of Service Executed (Morelli, Robert)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Robert E. Morelli, III, ECF #4 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney David C. Leimbach, ECF #3 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 13, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The PDF was not signed by local counsel. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
September 13, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David C. Leimbach. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9069548 #3 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 13, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robert E. Morelli, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9069552 #4 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 12, 2023 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed as to Driven 2 Drive Leasing, LLC served on 9/8/2023, answer due on 9/29/2023. (Morelli, Robert)
September 12, 2023 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed as to White Line Systems, LLC served on 9/12/2023, answer due on 10/3/2023. (Morelli, Robert)
September 12, 2023 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Rick Allred Systems Inc. served on 9/8/2023, answer due on 9/29/2023. (Morelli, Robert)
September 6, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Driven 2 Drive Leasing, LLC, Rick Allred Systems Inc., White Line Systems, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
September 5, 2023 Filing 11 Consent to Join Law Suit . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Consent by Plaintiff Kody Andrews) (Cottrell, Carolyn)
September 5, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Summons to Defendant Rick Allred Systems, Inc Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cottrell, Carolyn)
September 5, 2023 Filing 9 Proposed Summons to Defendant Driven 2 Drive Leasing, LLC (OR) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cottrell, Carolyn)
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 Proposed Summons to Defendant White Line Systems, LLC Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cottrell, Carolyn)
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons to Defendant Driven 2 Drive Leasing, LLC (TX) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cottrell, Carolyn)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Carolyn H. Cottrell, ECF #5 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 5, 2023 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Carolyn H. Cottrell. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9069886. Filed by Kody Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A- Federal Admissions) (Cottrell, Carolyn)
September 5, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Carolyn H. Cottrell. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9069886 #5 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
September 5, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David C. Leimbach. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9069548 #3 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
September 1, 2023 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robert E. Morelli, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9069552. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Kody Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A- Federal Admissions) (Morelli, Robert) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/13/2023) (cw).
September 1, 2023 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David C. Leimbach. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9069548. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Kody Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A- Federal Admissions) (Leimbach, David) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/13/2023) (cw).
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/27/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/26/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 1/26/2024. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sb)
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9062496 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kody Andrews against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Stark, Whitney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. White Line Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kody Andrews
Represented By: Whitney B. Stark
Represented By: Carolyn H. Cottrell
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Represented By: David C. Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Line Systems, LLC
Represented By: Christopher F. McCracken
Represented By: E.A. Meg Barankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Driven 2 Drive Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Christopher F. McCracken
Represented By: E.A. Meg Barankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Allred Systems Inc. doing business as Allred Systems
Represented By: E.A. Meg Barankin
Represented By: Christopher F. McCracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?