Hacker et al v. St. Charles Health System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gabriel Hacker, Hannah Olson and Lauren Radcliffe
Defendant: St. Charles Health System, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01530
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Consistent with the Parties' joint stipulation, ECF 14, this Court DISMISSES Plaintiff Hacker's claims without prejudice, with each party to pay its own costs and attorney's fees as pertaining to prosecuting and defending against Plaintiff Hacker's claims, and REMANDS this case (Case No. 23CV24330) to the Circuit Court of the State of Oregon for the County of Multnomah for further proceedings. Signed on 12/5/2023 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss & Proposed Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lewallen, Shanti)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: This Court GRANTS the Joint Motion for Extension of Time, ECF #12 . The Joint Status Report is now due 12/5/2023. All future motions for extension must be filed at least seven (7) days in advance of the relevant deadline. Ordered on 11/28/2023 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
November 28, 2023 Filing 12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lewallen, Shanti)
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTES of Proceedings: This Court held a telephonic status conference with the Parties concerning their Stipulated Motion to Stay, ECF #6 . As stated on the record, the Parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report, in the form of a motion, proposing next steps for how the case should proceed. The Joint Status Report is due 11/28/2023. Shanti S. Lewallen and Andrew J. Horowitz present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Sarah Elizabeth Ames Benedict and Timothy M. Cunningham present as counsel for Defendant. Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Karin J. Immergut presiding. (jy)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 by attorney Bruce C Fox. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 by attorney Andrew J Horowitz. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
October 26, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrew J Horowitz. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9127690 #5 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
October 26, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Bruce C Fox. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9127653 #4 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order Regarding Stipulated Motion for Stay, ECF #6 : Telephonic status conference is set for 11/15/2023 at 09:30AM. This Court VACATES all existing deadlines, ECF #3 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut on 10/25/2023.
October 25, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: An incorrect PDF was attached to the entries. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect ones. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
October 24, 2023 Filing 6 Stipulated Motion for Stay . Filed by St. Charles Health System, Inc.. (Ames Benedict, Sarah)
October 24, 2023 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrew J Horowitz. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9127690. Filed by Gabriel Hacker, Hannah Olson, Lauren Radcliffe. (Horowitz, Andrew) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/25/2023) (cw).
October 24, 2023 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Bruce C Fox. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9127653. Filed by Gabriel Hacker, Hannah Olson, Lauren Radcliffe. (Fox, Bruce) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/25/2023) (cw).
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/16/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/18/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 3/18/2024. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by St. Charles Health System, Inc.. (Ames Benedict, Sarah)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 23CV24330 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9120646 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by St. Charles Health System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Ames Benedict, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hacker et al v. St. Charles Health System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Hacker
Represented By: Shanti S. Lewallen
Represented By: Andrew J Horowitz
Represented By: Bruce C Fox
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Ames Benedict
Represented By: Timothy M. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Olson
Represented By: Shanti S. Lewallen
Represented By: Andrew J Horowitz
Represented By: Bruce C Fox
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Ames Benedict
Represented By: Timothy M. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Radcliffe
Represented By: Shanti S. Lewallen
Represented By: Bruce C Fox
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Ames Benedict
Represented By: Andrew J Horowitz
Represented By: Timothy M. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy M. Cunningham
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Ames Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?