Thielman et al v. Kotek et al
Plaintiff: Marc Thielman, Senator Dennis Linthicum, Senator Kim Thatcher, Jeff Kropf, Mark Anderson, Chuck Wiese, Janice Dysinger, Steven McGuire, Rick Riley, Gabriel Buehler, Don Powers and Ben Edtl
Defendant: Tina Kotek, Lavonne Griffin-Valade and Molly Woon
Case Number: 3:2023cv01639
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Referring Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 25 Motion to Dismiss . Filed by All Defendants. (Castelli, Thomas)
January 5, 2024 Filing 24 Declaration of Luke Belant in Support of Defendants' Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Castelli, Thomas)
January 5, 2024 Filing 23 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 . Filed by All Defendants. (Castelli, Thomas)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #21 . Defendants' Response is due by 1/5/2024. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 21, 2023 Filing 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 . Filed by All Defendants. (Castelli, Thomas)
December 19, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of Brian Simmonds Marshall appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Marshall, Brian)
December 19, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance of Thomas H. Castelli appearing on behalf of Tina Kotek, LaVonne Griffin-Valade, Molly Woon. Filed by on behalf of Tina Kotek, LaVonne Griffin-Valade, Molly Woon. (Castelli, Thomas)
December 12, 2023 Filing 18 Declaration of Gabriel Buehler . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 17 Declaration of Ben Edtl . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 16 Declaration of Steven McGuire . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 15 Declaration of Senator Kim Thatcher . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 14 Declaration of Mark Anderson . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 Declaration of Marc Thielman . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 12 Declaration of Janice Dysinger . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 Declaration of Jeff Kropf . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 10 Declaration of Don Powers . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 Declaration of Chuck Wiese . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 Declaration of Rick Riley . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 Declaration of Senator Dennis Linthicum . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 6 Declaration of Stephen Joncus . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Joncus, Stephen)
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to LaVonne Griffin-Valade, Tina Kotek, Molly Woon. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Joncus, Stephen)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/8/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/8/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 4/8/2024. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sb)
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9145284 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Chuck Wiese, Don Powers, Dennis Linthicum, Jeff Kropf, Mark Anderson, Rick Riley, Steven McGuire, Marc Thielman, Ben Edtl, Janice Dysinger, Gabriel Buehler, Kim Thatcher against Tina Kotek, Lavonne Griffin-Valade, Molly Woon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet). (Joncus, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thielman et al v. Kotek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Thielman
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senator Dennis Linthicum
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senator Kim Thatcher
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Kropf
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anderson
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Wiese
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Dysinger
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven McGuire
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Riley
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Buehler
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Powers
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Edtl
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Kotek
Represented By: Brian Simmonds Marshall
Represented By: Thomas H. Castelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavonne Griffin-Valade
Represented By: Brian Simmonds Marshall
Represented By: Thomas H. Castelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Woon
Represented By: Brian Simmonds Marshall
Represented By: Thomas H. Castelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?