A.S. v. State of Oregon, et al
Plaintiff: A.S.
Defendant: State of Oregon, Marilyn Jones, Glenda Marshall, Jana McLellan, Sequel TSI Holdings, LLC, Sequel Youth Services of Red Rock Canyon, LLC, Sequel Youth and Family Services, LLC, Ryan Santi, Gena Palm, John Stupak, Red Rock Canyon School, LLC, Red Rock Canyon School Non-Profit Organization and Vivant Behavioral Healthcare, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01643
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 Filing 18 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand. . Filed by Marilyn Jones, State of Oregon, Glenda Marshall, Jana McLellan. (Baumchen, Drew)
January 2, 2024 Filing 17 Answer To Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 7.1. Filed by Vivant Behavioral Healthcare, LLC. (Thind, Minney)
December 18, 2023 Filing 16 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Red Rock Canyon School Non-Profit Organization waiver sent on 12/13/2023. Filed by A.S.. (Ross, Jeremiah)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Red Rock Canyon School, LLC waiver sent on 12/13/2023. Filed by A.S.. (Ross, Jeremiah)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendants' corporate disclosure statement is due by 12/14/2023. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman (kms)
December 13, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Gena Palm, Ryan Santi, Sequel TSI Holdings, LLC, Sequel Youth Services of Red Rock Canyon, LLC, Sequel Youth and Family Services, LLC, John Stupak. (Hyer, Michelle)
December 13, 2023 Filing 12 Declaration of MLH . Filed by Gena Palm, Ryan Santi, Sequel TSI Holdings, LLC, Sequel Youth Services of Red Rock Canyon, LLC, Sequel Youth and Family Services, LLC, John Stupak. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time, #11 .) (Hyer, Michelle)
December 13, 2023 Filing 11 Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Gena Palm, Ryan Santi, Sequel TSI Holdings, LLC, Sequel Youth Services of Red Rock Canyon, LLC, Sequel Youth and Family Services, LLC, John Stupak. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hyer, Michelle)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michelle Hyer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9193206. Filed by Gena Palm, Ryan Santi, Sequel TSI Holdings, LLC, Sequel Youth Services of Red Rock Canyon, LLC, Sequel Youth and Family Services, LLC, John Stupak. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Cert of Current Status) (Hyer, Michelle) Modified on 12/12/2023 to correct attorney requesting Pro Hac Vice admission (dino).
December 12, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michelle Hyer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9193206 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 Defendant Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Vivant Behavioral Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Thind, Minney)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: I GRANT Defendants' Motions for Extension #4 and #5 . Accordingly, Vivant Behavioral Healthcare's Answer is due by 11/29/2023, and the Government Defendants' Answer is due by 1/3/2024. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 Declaration of Drew Baumchen In Support Of State Defendants' Motion For Extension Of Time To Answer/ Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Marilyn Jones, Glenda Marshall, Jana McLellan, State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #5 .) (Baumchen, Drew)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer / Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Marilyn Jones, State of Oregon, Glenda Marshall, Jana McLellan. (Baumchen, Drew)
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer A Complaint / Petition. Filed by Vivant Behavioral Healthcare, LLC. (Thind, Minney)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Sequel Youth Services of Red Rock Canyon, LLC, Sequel TSI Holdings, LLC, Sequel Youth and Family Services, LLC. (Cannon, Eron)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 3/7/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/8/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 4/8/2024. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 23CV38869 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9146569 issued.. Filed by Marilyn Jones, State of Oregon, by and through it's Department of Human Services, Glenda Marshall, Jana McLellan (Attachments: #1 Attachment Consent of Co-Defendants, #2 Attachment Circuit Court Docket and Filings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Baumchen, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.S. v. State of Oregon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Jeremiah Vail Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oregon
Represented By: Craig M. Johnson
Represented By: Drew K. Baumchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Jones
Represented By: Craig M. Johnson
Represented By: Drew K. Baumchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Marshall
Represented By: Craig M. Johnson
Represented By: Drew K. Baumchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana McLellan
Represented By: Craig M. Johnson
Represented By: Drew K. Baumchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequel TSI Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Eron Cannon
Represented By: Michelle L. Hyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequel Youth Services of Red Rock Canyon, LLC
Represented By: Eron Cannon
Represented By: Michelle L. Hyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequel Youth and Family Services, LLC
Represented By: Eron Cannon
Represented By: Michelle L. Hyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Santi
Represented By: Eron Cannon
Represented By: Michelle L. Hyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena Palm
Represented By: Eron Cannon
Represented By: Michelle L. Hyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stupak
Represented By: Eron Cannon
Represented By: Michelle L. Hyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rock Canyon School, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rock Canyon School Non-Profit Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivant Behavioral Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Minney Thind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?