Lipka et al v. City of Portland et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Lipka, Lipka Family, Rayna Montgomery, Montgomery Family and Danita Lipka
Defendant: City of Portland, Gregory Adrian, Jerrold Higginborn, Lt. Passadore, Portland Police Chief, Jerrold J. Higginborn, Anthony Passadore, Danielle Outlaw, Ted Wheeler, Hansen and Jerrold J Higginbotham
Case Number: 3:2023cv01690
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Adrienne Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 26 Affidavit of Service upon City of Portland served on 1/5/2024, answer due on 1/26/2024 Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Andersen, Kelly)
January 12, 2024 Filing 25 Affidavit of Service upon Anthony Passadore served on 1/8/2024, answer due on 1/29/2024 Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Andersen, Kelly)
January 5, 2024 Filing 24 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jerrold J Higginbotham. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
January 5, 2024 Filing 23 Amended Proposed Summons - Higginbotham Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Andersen, Kelly)
January 5, 2024 Filing 22 Second Amended Complaint . Filed by Joshua Lipka against All Defendants. (Andersen, Kelly)
January 4, 2024 Filing 21 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sgt. Hansen. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
January 4, 2024 Filing 20 Proposed Summons - Sargeant Hanson Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Andersen, Kelly)
January 3, 2024 Filing 19 Summons Issued Electronically as to Gregory Adrian, City of Portland, Jerrold J. Higginborn, Danielle Outlaw, Anthony Passadore, Ted Wheeler. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
January 3, 2024 Filing 18 Proposed Summons - Ted Wheeler Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Andersen, Kelly)
January 3, 2024 Filing 17 Proposed Summons - Jerrold Higginborn Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Andersen, Kelly)
January 3, 2024 Filing 16 Proposed Summons - Gregory Adrian Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Andersen, Kelly)
January 3, 2024 Filing 15 Proposed Summons - Danielle Outlaw Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Andersen, Kelly)
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 Proposed Summons - City of Portland Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Andersen, Kelly)
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 Proposed Summons - Anthony Passadore Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Andersen, Kelly)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of attorney Kelly Andersen's Notice, ECF #11 , requesting termination of the pro bono counsel appointment. The Court terminates the appointment of Kelly Andersen as pro bono counsel for plaintiff Joshua Lipka. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order upon Joshua Lipka. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 12/28/2023.) (mja)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 Notice re Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel,, #6 Completion of Pro Bono Appointment Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel,, #6 .) (Andersen, Kelly)
December 21, 2023 Filing 10 Amended Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights. Filed by Joshua Lipka against All Defendants. (Andersen, Kelly)
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 Pro Bono Appointment Response. Representation is accepted as specified in the Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel .(Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel,, #6 .) Filed by Joshua Lipka. (Andersen, Kelly)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel, ECF #7 , is DENIED as moot. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 12/4/2023.) (joha)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Joshua Lipka. (bd)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Appointing Kelly L. Andersen for Joshua Lipka as Pro Bono Counsel (Specific Purpose Appointment) If representation is accepted, counsel is to file the attached Notice of Completion of Pro Bono Appointment upon completion of the specific purpose(s) of Assisting plaintiffs with filing an amended complaint. Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 12/12/2023. Signed on 11/28/2023 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/28/2023.) (joha)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/28/2023.) (joha)
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/15/23.) (eo)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Joshua Lipka. (eo)
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Joshua Lipka. (eo)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Rayna Montgomery, Lipka Family, Joshua Lipka, Montgomery Family against All Defendants. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipka et al v. City of Portland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Lipka
Represented By: Kelly L. Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lipka Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayna Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montgomery Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danita Lipka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Portland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Adrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrold Higginborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Passadore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Police Chief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrold J. Higginborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Passadore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrold J Higginbotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?