Civelli et al v. Lumen Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jarrett Civelli, Christopher Rosing and Jeffrey Haagenson
Defendant: LUMEN TECHNOLOGIES, INC., CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATONS, LLC, QWEST BROADBAND SERVICES, INC. d/b/a CENTURYLINK, Qwest Services Corporation, QWEST CORPORATION d/b/a CENTURYLINK QC, CenturyLink Communications, LLC, Qwest Broadband Services, Inc. doing business as CenturyLink and Qwest Corporation doing business as CenturyLink QC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01739
Filed: November 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Adrienne Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 cl Class Action Fairness Action - 2005
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, ECF #17 , is GRANTED. Defendants' response to the complaint is now due February 19, 2024. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
January 4, 2024 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Crooks, Sarah)
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Crooks, Sarah)
December 14, 2023 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service upon Qwest Corporation served on 12/14/2023, answer due on 1/4/2024 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 14, 2023 Filing 15 Affidavit of Service upon Qwest Services Corporation served on 12/14/2023, answer due on 1/4/2024 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service upon Qwest Broadband Services, Inc. served on 12/14/2023, answer due on 1/4/2024 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 14, 2023 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service upon CenturyLink Communications, LLC served on 12/14/2023, answer due on 1/4/2024 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service upon Lumen Technologies, Inc. served on 12/14/2023, answer due on 1/4/2024 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 ; Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 . Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to CenturyLink Communications, LLC, Lumen Technologies, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation, Qwest Services Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
November 29, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Spencer Scot Hughes. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9171704 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
November 29, 2023 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kristen Simplicio. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9171690 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Spencer Scot Hughes. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9171704. Filed by Jarrett Civelli, Jeffrey Haagenson, Christopher Rosing. (Hughes, Spencer)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kristen Simplicio. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9171690. Filed by Jarrett Civelli, Jeffrey Haagenson, Christopher Rosing. (Simplicio, Kristen)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 Amended Proposed Summons QWest Corporation Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 Amended Proposed Summons QWest Services Corporation Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 Amended Proposed Summons QWest Broadband Services, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Amended Proposed Summons CenturyLink Communications, LLC Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Amended Proposed Summons Lumen Technologies, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Adrienne Nelson and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/26/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/25/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 4/25/2024. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (sb)
November 24, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9166270 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jeffrey Haagenson, Jarrett Civelli, Christopher Rosing against CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATONS, LLC, LUMEN TECHNOLOGIES, INC., QWEST BROADBAND SERVICES, INC. d/b/a CENTURYLINK, QWEST CORPORATION d/b/a CENTURYLINK QC, Qwest Services Corporation (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons). (Dahab, Nadia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Civelli et al v. Lumen Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrett Civelli
Represented By: David F. Sugerman
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Tim A. Quenelle
Represented By: Kristen Simplicio
Represented By: Spencer Scot Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Rosing
Represented By: David F. Sugerman
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Tim A. Quenelle
Represented By: Kristen Simplicio
Represented By: Spencer Scot Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Haagenson
Represented By: David F. Sugerman
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Tim A. Quenelle
Represented By: Kristen Simplicio
Represented By: Spencer Scot Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUMEN TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QWEST BROADBAND SERVICES, INC. d/b/a CENTURYLINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Services Corporation
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QWEST CORPORATION d/b/a CENTURYLINK QC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Communications, LLC
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Broadband Services, Inc. doing business as CenturyLink
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Corporation doing business as CenturyLink QC
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?