Miles et al v. Clackamas County et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Miles and Estate of Derrick Dewayne Clark Jr.
Defendant: Clackamas County, Daniel Ferguson, Zacharay Cole, Alexander Mawson and Officers Does I X
Case Number: 3:2023cv01805
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 17 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Zacharay Cole waiver sent on 1/25/2024. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hamoudi, Mohammad)
January 25, 2024 Filing 16 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Alexander Mawson waiver sent on 1/24/2024. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hamoudi, Mohammad)
January 25, 2024 Filing 15 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Daniel Ferguson waiver sent on 1/25/2024. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hamoudi, Mohammad)
January 25, 2024 Filing 14 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Clackamas County waiver sent on 1/25/2024. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hamoudi, Mohammad)
January 23, 2024 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Daniel Ferguson, Alexander Mawson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (gd)
January 23, 2024 Filing 12 Proposed Summons re Defendant Mawson Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hamoudi, Mohammad)
January 23, 2024 Filing 11 Proposed Summons re Defendant Ferguson Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hamoudi, Mohammad)
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 Proposed Summons re Defendant Cole Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hamoudi, Mohammad)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #8 ) for Karen K. Koehler. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Karen K. Koehler. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9240085. Filed by Estate of Derrick Dewayne Clark Jr., Sarah Miles. (Koehler, Karen)
January 19, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Karen K. Koehler. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9240085 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #5 ) for Mohammad Ali Hamoudi. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 18, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: An incorrect PDF was attached to the entry. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
January 18, 2024 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Mohammad Ali Hamoudi. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9238098. Filed by Estate of Derrick Dewayne Clark Jr., Sarah Miles. (Hamoudi, Mohammad) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/18/2024) (cw).
January 18, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Mohammad Ali Hamoudi. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9238098 #5 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
December 11, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of James S. Smith appearing on behalf of Zacharay Cole. Filed by on behalf of Zacharay Cole. (Smith, James)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Clackamas County. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (dino)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/1/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/29/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 4/29/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dino)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9176876 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sarah Miles against Clackamas County, Zachary Cole, Daniel Ferguson, Alexander Mawson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Clackamas County). (Grube, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles et al v. Clackamas County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Miles
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Grube
Represented By: Karen K. Koehler
Represented By: Mohammad Ali Hamoudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Derrick Dewayne Clark Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Grube
Represented By: Karen K. Koehler
Represented By: Mohammad Ali Hamoudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clackamas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zacharay Cole
Represented By: James S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Mawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officers Does I X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?