Metro v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Petitioner: Metro
Respondent: Shell PLC, Occidental Petroleum, TotalEnergies SE, Totalenergies Marketing USA, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell USA, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products US, BP PLC, BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc, Chevron Corp., Chevron U. S. A., Inc., ConocoPhillips, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Space Age Fuel, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Total S.A., Total Specialties USA, Inc., Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corp., Marathon Petroleum Corp., Peabody Energy Corp., Koch Industries, Inc., American Petroleum Institute, Western States Petroleum Association, McKinsey and Company, Inc., McKinsey Holdings Inc. and Oregon Institute of Science and Medicine
Case Number: 3:2024cv00019
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Referring Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Real Property Property Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Filing 111 Notice of Appearance of Douglas J. Raab appearing on behalf of Space Age Fuel, Inc.. Filed by on behalf of Space Age Fuel, Inc.. (Raab, Douglas)
February 29, 2024 Filing 110 Notice of Appearance of Scott L. Jensen appearing on behalf of Space Age Fuel, Inc.. Filed by on behalf of Space Age Fuel, Inc.. (Jensen, Scott)
February 27, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Anna Rotman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9294683 #108 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
February 27, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Allyson Arias. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9294704 #109 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
February 27, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kenneth Young. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9294637 #107 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
February 26, 2024 Filing 109 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Allyson Arias. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9294704. Filed by TotalEnergies SE, Totalenergies Marketing USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Arias, Allyson)
February 26, 2024 Filing 108 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Anna Rotman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9294683. Filed by TotalEnergies SE, Totalenergies Marketing USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rotman, Anna)
February 26, 2024 Filing 107 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kenneth Young. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9294637. Filed by TotalEnergies SE, Totalenergies Marketing USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Young, Kenneth)
February 26, 2024 Filing 106 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filed by TotalEnergies SE, Totalenergies Marketing USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rotman, Anna)
February 26, 2024 Filing 105 Notice of Appearance of Joshua P. Stump appearing on behalf of TotalEnergies SE, Totalenergies Marketing USA. Filed by on behalf of TotalEnergies SE, Totalenergies Marketing USA. (Stump, Joshua)
February 22, 2024 Filing 104 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9253616. The request has been granted and the amount of $300.00 will be refunded to Shreedhar R. Patel Related Doc #82 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (lp)
February 16, 2024 Filing 103 Reply to Respondents' Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #69 . Filed by Metro. (Schechter, Richard)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: Granting attorney Dennis Howe's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #98 , for respondents Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell USA, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273644. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: Granting attorney David C. Frederick's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #97 , for respondents Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell USA, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273627. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: Granting attorney James M. Webster, III's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #96 , for respondents Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell USA, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273615. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: Granting attorney Daniel Severson's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #95 , for respondents Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell USA, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273543. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 12, 2024 Filing 98 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Dennis Howe. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273644. Filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell USA, Inc.. (Howe, Dennis)
February 12, 2024 Filing 97 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David C. Frederick. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273627. Filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell USA, Inc.. (Frederick, David)
February 12, 2024 Filing 96 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James M. Webster, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273615. Filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell USA, Inc.. (Webster, James)
February 12, 2024 Filing 95 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel Severson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273543. Filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell USA, Inc.. (Severson, Daniel)
February 12, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel Severson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273543 #95 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
February 12, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Dennis Howe. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273644 #98 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
February 12, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James M. Webster, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273615 #96 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
February 12, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David C. Frederick. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9273627 #97 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
February 9, 2024 Filing 94 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court #69 Oral Argument requested. Filed by American Petroleum Institute, BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc, Chevron Corp., Chevron U. S. A., Inc., ConocoPhillips, Equilon Enterprises LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Koch Industries, Inc., Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corp., Marathon Petroleum Corp., McKinsey Holdings Inc., McKinsey and Company, Inc., Motiva Enterprises LLC, Occidental Petroleum, Peabody Energy Corp., Shell USA, Inc., Space Age Fuel, Inc., TotalEnergies SE, Totalenergies Marketing USA, Valero Energy Corporation, Western States Petroleum Association. (Toal, Daniel)
February 7, 2024 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell USA, Inc.. (White, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2024 Filing 92 Notice of Appearance of Elizabeth H. White appearing on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell USA, Inc. . Filed by on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell USA, Inc.. (White, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: Granting attorney Diana Reiter's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #88 , for defendants BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9268670. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: Granting attorney John D. Lombardo's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #87 , for defendants BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9268661. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: Granting attorney Jonathan W. Hughes's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #86 , for defendants BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9268632. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 7, 2024 Filing 88 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Diana Reiter. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9268670. Filed by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. (Reiter, Diana)
February 7, 2024 Filing 87 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney John D. Lombardo. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9268661. Filed by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. (Lombardo, John)
February 7, 2024 Filing 86 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jonathan W. Hughes. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9268632. Filed by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. (Hughes, Jonathan)
February 7, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Diana Reiter. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9268670 #88 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
February 7, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jonathan W. Hughes. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9268632 #86 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
February 7, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney John D. Lombardo. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9268661 #87 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
February 6, 2024 Filing 85 Notice of Appearance of Ryan Thomas O'Hollaren appearing on behalf of Marathon Oil Corp., Marathon Oil Company. Filed by on behalf of Marathon Oil Corp., Marathon Oil Company. (O'Hollaren, Ryan)
February 6, 2024 Filing 84 Notice of Appearance of Pilar C. French appearing on behalf of Marathon Oil Corp., Marathon Oil Company. Filed by on behalf of Marathon Oil Corp., Marathon Oil Company. (French, Pilar)
February 6, 2024 Filing 83 Amended Notice of Appearance of Brad S. Daniels appearing on behalf of BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. Filed by on behalf of BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. (Daniels, Brad)
February 6, 2024 Filing 82 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 72 . Filed by Metro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt of Transaction, #2 Exhibit Notice of Electronic Filing) (Simon, Jeffrey)
February 5, 2024 Filing 81 Notice of Appearance of Brad S. Daniels appearing on behalf of BP America, Inc., BP PLC, BP Products North America, Inc. Filed by on behalf of BP America, Inc., BP PLC, BP Products North America, Inc. (Daniels, Brad)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: Granting attorney Richard Schechter's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #76 , for petitioner Metro; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9257010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 2, 2024 Filing 79 Notice of Appearance of Richard Schechter appearing on behalf of Metro. Filed by on behalf of Metro. (Schechter, Richard)
January 31, 2024 Filing 78 Notice of Appearance of Shreedhar Rajnikant Patel appearing on behalf of Metro. Filed by on behalf of Metro. (Patel, Shreedhar)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Motion Hearing for Thursday, March 7, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You regarding Motion to Remand to State Court #69 . Details related to this conference will be forwarded to counsel by separate correspondence. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 30, 2024 Filing 76 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Richard Schechter. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9257010. Filed by Metro. (Schechter, Richard)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: Granting attorney Jeffrey B. Simon's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #71 , for petitioner Metro; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9253702. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 30, 2024 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Winters, Evelyn)
January 30, 2024 Filing 73 Notice of Appearance of Evelyn English Winters appearing on behalf of American Petroleum Institute. Filed by on behalf of American Petroleum Institute. (Winters, Evelyn)
January 30, 2024 Filing 72 A duplicate payment in the amount of $300.00 was submitted by Metro in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court's website. Refund Request is Due 2/9/2024. (nd)
January 30, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Richard Schechter. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9257010 #76 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 29, 2024 Filing 71 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jeffrey B. Simon. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9253702. Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jeffrey B.Simon Court Admissions) (Simon, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jeffrey B. Simon. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9253702 #71 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 26, 2024 Filing 70 Declaration of Tim Williams in Support of Metro's Motion for Remand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #69 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Williams, Timothy)
January 26, 2024 Filing 69 Motion to Remand to State Court. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Timothy)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: Granting attorney Robert Kingsley Smith's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #65 , for respondent ConocoPhillips; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9251472. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Granting attorney Hallie Levin's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #64 , for respondent ConocoPhillips; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9251442. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: Granting attorney Matthew T. Martens's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #63 , for respondent ConocoPhillips; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9251393. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 26, 2024 Filing 65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robert Kingsley Smith. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9251472. Filed by ConocoPhillips. (Smith, Robert)
January 26, 2024 Filing 64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Hallie Levin. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9251442. Filed by ConocoPhillips. (Levin, Hallie)
January 26, 2024 Filing 63 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matthew T. Martens. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9251393. Filed by ConocoPhillips. (Martens, Matthew)
January 26, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matthew T. Martens. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9251393 #63 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 26, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Hallie Levin. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9251442 #64 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 26, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robert Kingsley Smith. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9251472 #65 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: Granting attorney Matthew Johnson's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #60 for respondent Valero Energy Corporation; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9245273. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: Granting attorney James F. Bennett's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #59 for respondent Valero Energy Corporation; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9245253. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 23, 2024 Filing 60 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matthew Johnson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9245273. Filed by Valero Energy Corporation. (Johnson, Matthew)
January 23, 2024 Filing 59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James F. Bennett. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9245253. Filed by Valero Energy Corporation. (Bennett, James)
January 23, 2024 Filing 58 Notice of Service of Order on Oregon Institute of Science and Medicine Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Williams, Timothy)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Respondent Exxon Mobil Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #19 is granted. The deadline to respond to the Petition is 14 days after Metro's request for remand is adjudicated. All discovery and pretrial deadlines are stayed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 23, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James F. Bennett. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9245253 #59 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 23, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matthew Johnson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9245273 #60 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 22, 2024 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Valero Energy Corporation. (Pitzer, Jeff)
January 22, 2024 Filing 55 Notice of Appearance of Jeff S. Pitzer, Peter M. Grabiel appearing on behalf of Valero Energy Corporation. Filed by on behalf of Valero Energy Corporation. (Pitzer, Jeff)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Given there are no objections to the proposed schedule set forth in the court's January 16, 2024 order #38 , the briefing schedule to resolve the question whether an ORCP 37 perpetuation petition may be removed to federal court is as follows: petitioner's opening brief is due on or before January 26, 2024, respondents' opposition brief is due on February 9, 2024, and petitioner's reply brief is due on February 16, 2024. As the court directed the parties to do in Multnomah County v. Exxon, 3:23-cv-1213-YY, respondents shall coordinate their efforts to file a single joint opposition to petitioner's opening brief that will address all common issues and will not exceed 45 pages, excluding any exhibits and other supporting materials. If any respondent believes it necessary to file a separate brief to address issues that are specific to that individual respondent, it shall request permission from the court in advance and explain why separate briefing is necessary. Any separate briefs, if allowed, shall be limited to 15 pages, excluding any exhibits and other supporting materials. If separate briefing is allowed, it shall not be duplicative of the joint brief. The word limitations under LR 7-2 will not apply in light of the page limits set forth in this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 19, 2024 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Koch Industries, Inc.. (Asai, Kristin)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: Granting attorney Cassandra C. Collins's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #48 , for respondent Marathon Petroleum Corp.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9238543. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Granting attorney William Anthony Burck's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #47 , for respondent Koch Industries, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237505. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Granting attorney Michelle Schmit's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #46 , for respondent Koch Industries, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237498. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Granting attorney Alexander Merton's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #43 , for respondent Koch Industries, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237250. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 18, 2024 Filing 48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Cassandra C. Collins. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9238543. Filed by Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Collins, Cassandra)
January 18, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Cassandra C. Collins. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9238543 #48 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 17, 2024 Filing 47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney William Anthony Burck. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237505. Filed by Koch Industries, Inc.. (Burck, William)
January 17, 2024 Filing 46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michelle Schmit. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237498. Filed by Koch Industries, Inc.. (Schmit, Michelle)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Granting attorney Shawn Patrick Regan's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #42 , for respondent Marathon Petroleum Corp.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Granting attorney Shannon S. Broome's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #41 , for respondent Marathon Petroleum Corp.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9236995. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 17, 2024 Filing 43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Alexander Merton. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237250. Filed by Koch Industries, Inc.. (Merton, Alexander)
January 17, 2024 Filing 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Shawn Patrick Regan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237013. Filed by Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Regan, Shawn)
January 17, 2024 Filing 41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Shannon S. Broome. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9236995. Filed by Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Broome, Shannon)
January 17, 2024 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Wylie, Patrick)
January 17, 2024 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance of Patrick C. Wylie, Matthew R. Wiese appearing on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corp.. Filed by on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Wylie, Patrick)
January 17, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Alexander Merton. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237250 #43 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 17, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney William Anthony Burck. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237505 #47 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 17, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michelle Schmit. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237498 #46 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 17, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Shannon S. Broome. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9236995 #41 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 17, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Shawn Patrick Regan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9237013 #42 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: As reflected in the written order issued this date, notice of this order shall be provided to the attorneys of record in Multnomah County v. Exxon Mobile Corp., et al., Case No. 3:23-cv-01213-YY. If anyone disagrees with Exxon's proposed briefing schedule for resolving the question of whether the petition should be remanded to state court, they shall file a document proposing an alternative schedule by January 19, 2024. For any of respondent who is not one of the defendants in Case No. 3:23-cv-1213-YY, Metro shall make good faith efforts to notify those respondents of this order and provide a report to the court of the attempts it made. Signed on 1/16/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Granting attorney Duke K. McCall, III's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #36 for Respondent Occidental Petroleum; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9233906. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 12, 2024 Filing 36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Duke K. McCall, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9233906. Filed by Occidental Petroleum. (McCall, Duke)
January 12, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Duke K. McCall, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9233906 #36 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 11, 2024 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Western States Petroleum Association. (Hovda, Kc)
January 11, 2024 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Occidental Petroleum. (Hoesly, Cody)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Granting attorney Andrew Leiendecker's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #23 for Respondent Koch Industries, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9228136. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) Modified text on 1/12/2024 (pvh).
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Granting attorney Andrew W. Davis's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #22 for Respondent Koch Industries, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9228133. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) Modified text on 1/12/2024 (pvh).
January 10, 2024 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance of Christopher John Riley appearing on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. Filed by on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. (Riley, Christopher)
January 10, 2024 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance of Kc Lynne Hovda appearing on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. Filed by on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. (Hovda, Kc)
January 10, 2024 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance of Joshua M. Sasaki appearing on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. Filed by on behalf of Western States Petroleum Association. (Sasaki, Joshua)
January 10, 2024 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by McKinsey Holdings Inc.. (Davidson, Clifford)
January 10, 2024 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by McKinsey and Company, Inc.. (Davidson, Clifford)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Granting attorney Todd Noteboom's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #21 for Respondent Koch Industries, Inc.; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9228128. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) Modified text on 1/12/2024 (pvh).
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Granting attorney Roger Worthington's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #14 for Petitioner Metro; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9224398. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) Modified text on 1/12/2024 (pvh).
January 10, 2024 Filing 24 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Adrienne Nelson to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (cw)
January 10, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Todd Noteboom. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9228128 #21 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 10, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrew Leiendecker. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9228136 #23 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 10, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrew W. Davis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9228133 #22 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 9, 2024 Filing 23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrew Leiendecker. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9228136. Filed by Koch Industries, Inc.. (Leiendecker, Andrew)
January 9, 2024 Filing 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrew W. Davis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9228133. Filed by Koch Industries, Inc.. (Davis, Andrew)
January 9, 2024 Filing 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Todd Noteboom. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9228128. Filed by Koch Industries, Inc.. (Noteboom, Todd)
January 9, 2024 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of J. Matthew Donohue, Kristin M. Asai appearing on behalf of Koch Industries, Inc.. Filed by on behalf of Koch Industries, Inc.. (Donohue, J.)
January 9, 2024 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (McDermott, James)
January 9, 2024 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron U. S. A., Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee)
January 9, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of Julia E. Markley appearing on behalf of Chevron Corp., Chevron U. S. A., Inc.. Filed by on behalf of Chevron Corp., Chevron U. S. A., Inc.. (Markley, Julia)
January 9, 2024 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance of Renee E. Rothauge appearing on behalf of Chevron Corp., Chevron U. S. A., Inc.. Filed by on behalf of Chevron Corp., Chevron U. S. A., Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee)
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 Certificate of Service by Metro (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment, #10 Attachment, #11 Attachment, #12 Attachment, #13 Attachment, #14 Attachment, #15 Attachment, #16 Attachment, #17 Attachment, #18 Attachment, #19 Attachment, #20 Attachment, #21 Attachment, #22 Attachment, #23 Attachment) Filed by Metro. (Williams, Timothy)
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 Proposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Roger Worthington. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9224398. Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Worthington, Roger) Modified on 1/8/2024 to correct attorney requesting Pro Hac Vice admission (dino).
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 ; Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 ; Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 ; Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #11 . Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
January 8, 2024 Clerk's Review of Proposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Roger Worthington. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9224398 #14 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 5, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Karin J. Immergut to Judge Adrienne Nelson. (cw)
January 5, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Theodore V. Wells, Jr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9221103 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 5, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel J. Toal. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9221117 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 5, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Caitlin Grusauskas. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9221138 #11 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 5, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Yahonnes Cleary. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9221127 #10 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Caitlin Grusauskas. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9221138. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Grusauskas, Caitlin)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Yahonnes Cleary. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9221127. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Cleary, Yahonnes)
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel J. Toal. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9221117. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Toal, Daniel)
January 4, 2024 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Theodore V. Wells, Jr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9221103. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Wells, Theodore)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/3/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/3/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 6/3/2024. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (gd)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Mackenzie E. L. Wong appearing on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc., McKinsey Holdings Inc.. Filed by on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc., McKinsey Holdings Inc.. (Wong, Mackenzie)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Clifford S. Davidson appearing on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc., McKinsey Holdings Inc.. Filed by on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc., McKinsey Holdings Inc.. (Davidson, Clifford)
January 3, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (McDermott, James)
January 3, 2024 Filing 3 Declaration of Dwain M. Clifford . Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (McDermott, James)
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Toal . Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit) (McDermott, James)
January 3, 2024 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 23cv51762 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9219768 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (McDermott, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metro v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shell PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Occidental Petroleum
Represented By: Duke K. McCall, III
Represented By: Cody B. Hoesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TotalEnergies SE
Represented By: Allyson Arias
Represented By: Joshua P. Stump
Represented By: Anna Rotman
Represented By: Kenneth Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Totalenergies Marketing USA
Represented By: Joshua P. Stump
Represented By: Allyson Arias
Represented By: Anna Rotman
Represented By: Kenneth Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal
Represented By: Yahonnes Cleary
Represented By: James T. McDermott
Represented By: Dwain M. Clifford
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Caitlin Grusauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Royal Dutch Shell PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shell USA, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: James M. Webster, III
Represented By: Elizabeth H. White
Represented By: Daniel Severson
Represented By: Dennis Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Equilon Enterprises LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products US
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Daniel Severson
Represented By: Dennis Howe
Represented By: James M. Webster, III
Represented By: Elizabeth H. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BP PLC
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BP America, Inc.
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Diana Reiter
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BP Products North America, Inc
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Diana Reiter
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chevron Corp.
Represented By: Julia E. Markley
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chevron U. S. A., Inc.
Represented By: Julia E. Markley
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ConocoPhillips
Represented By: Michael J. Estok
Represented By: Hallie Levin
Represented By: Matthew T. Martens
Represented By: Robert Kingsley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anadarko Petroleum Corp.
Represented By: Cody B. Hoesly
Represented By: Duke K. McCall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Space Age Fuel, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Raab
Represented By: Scott L. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Valero Energy Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Jeff S. Pitzer
Represented By: Peter M. Grabiel
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Total S.A.
Represented By: Allyson Arias
Represented By: Anna Rotman
Represented By: Joshua P. Stump
Represented By: Kenneth Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Total Specialties USA, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson Arias
Represented By: Joshua P. Stump
Represented By: Anna Rotman
Represented By: Kenneth Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marathon Oil Company
Represented By: Pilar C. French
Represented By: Ryan Thomas O'Hollaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marathon Oil Corp.
Represented By: Pilar C. French
Represented By: Ryan Thomas O'Hollaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marathon Petroleum Corp.
Represented By: Matthew R. Wiese
Represented By: Cassandra C. Collins
Represented By: Shannon S. Broome
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Regan
Represented By: Patrick C. Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peabody Energy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Koch Industries, Inc.
Represented By: J. Matthew Donohue
Represented By: Kristin M. Asai
Represented By: Andrew W. Davis
Represented By: Andrew Leiendecker
Represented By: Todd Noteboom
Represented By: William Anthony Burck
Represented By: Alexander Merton
Represented By: Michelle Schmit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Evelyn English Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Western States Petroleum Association
Represented By: Christopher John Riley
Represented By: Joshua M. Sasaki
Represented By: Kc Lynne Hovda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Represented By: Mackenzie E. L. Wong
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: McKinsey Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Represented By: Mackenzie E. L. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Oregon Institute of Science and Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Metro
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Simon
Represented By: Timothy L. Williams
Represented By: James S. Coon
Represented By: Richard Schechter
Represented By: Shreedhar Rajnikant Patel
Represented By: Roger G Worthington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?