Reed v. Spark Driver et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Reed
Defendant: Spark Driver, Walmart, Inc. and Delivery Drivers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00057
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Filing 19 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration #14 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Morelli, Robert)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration, ECF #17 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to oppose Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, ECF #14 , is extended by seven (7) days, up to and including 3/1/2024. Ordered on 2/16/2024 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
February 16, 2024 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Compel Arbitration #14 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Christopher Reed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration) (Morelli, Robert)
February 9, 2024 Filing 16 Declaration of Alonzo Cardenas . Filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Compel #14 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Voelz, Scott)
February 9, 2024 Filing 15 Declaration of Ashley O'Brien . Filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Compel #14 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Voelz, Scott)
February 9, 2024 Filing 14 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Voelz, Scott)
February 9, 2024 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Voelz, Scott)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #11 by attorney Scott Voelz. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
February 7, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Scott Voelz. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9266956 #11 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
February 6, 2024 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Scott Voelz. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9266956. Filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Voelz, Scott)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 by attorney Allison Bader. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
February 2, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Allison Bader. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9261561 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
February 1, 2024 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Allison Bader. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9261561. Filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Bader, Allison)
January 30, 2024 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Walmart, Inc. served on 1/23/2024, answer due on 2/13/2024. (Cottrell, Carolyn)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 by attorney Carolyn H. Cottrell. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 by attorney Robert E. Morelli, III. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
January 23, 2024 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Carolyn H. Cottrell. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9244848. Filed by Christopher Reed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A- Federal Admissions) (Cottrell, Carolyn)
January 23, 2024 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robert E. Morelli, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9244831. Filed by Christopher Reed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Federal Admissions) (Morelli, Robert)
January 23, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Carolyn H. Cottrell. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9244848 #5 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 23, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robert E. Morelli, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9244831 #4 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 9, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Delivery Drivers, Inc., Spark Driver, Walmart, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (dino)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/8/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/7/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 6/7/2024. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (dino)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9227181 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Christopher Reed against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Stark, Whitney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Spark Driver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Reed
Represented By: Whitney B. Stark
Represented By: Carolyn H. Cottrell
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spark Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher F. McCracken
Represented By: Allison Bader
Represented By: Scott Voelz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delivery Drivers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?