Regional Local Union Nos. 846 and 847, International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers, AFL-CIO et al v. Next Century Rebar, LLC
Plaintiff: Regional District Council Welfare Plan and Trust, Regional District, Council Retirement Plan and Employee Benefit Plans Trust, Regional District Council Training Trust, Regional District Council Vacation Trust Fund, Regional Local Union Nos. 846 and 847, International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers, AFL-CIO, Local and Rebar Retirement Plan And Trust
Defendant: Next Century Rebar, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00082
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Employee Pension Plan
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #13 ). This case is dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default (ECF No. #8 ) and Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Order to Compel Accounting (ECF No. #9 ) are denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
February 22, 2024 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Evans, Michael)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF No. #10 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 2/23/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
February 9, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Next Century Rebar, LLC. Filed by Next Century Rebar, LLC. (Colley, Matthew)
February 9, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Next Century Rebar, LLC. (Colley, Matthew)
February 8, 2024 Filing 9 Motion for Order Motion for Default Order to Compel Accounting. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Default Order of Accounting, #2 Order to Compel Accounting, #3 Winter Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7) (Evans, Michael) Modified docket text on 2/13/2024. (gw).
February 8, 2024 Filing 8 Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk, #2 Attachment Clerk's Entry of Default) (Evans, Michael)
February 5, 2024 Filing 7 Proof of Service / Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants. (Cadonau, Cary)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #2 ) for Michael A. Evans. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 17, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: An incorrect PDF was attached to the entry (page direction incorrect). The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
January 17, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael A. Evans. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9234115 #2 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/13/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/10/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 6/10/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gd)
January 12, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Next Century Rebar, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (gd)
January 12, 2024 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael A.Evans. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9234115. Filed by Regional District Council Training Trust, f/k/a Local 846 Training Trust, By and Through its Board of Trustees, Regional District Council Vacation Trust Fund, f/k/a Local 846 Vacation Trust, By and Through Its Board of Trustees, Regional District Council Welfare Plan and Trust, f/k/a Local 846 Rebar Welfare Trust, By and Through Its Board of Trustees, Regional District, Council Retirement Plan and Employee Benefit Plans Trust, Regional Local Union Nos. 846 and 847, International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers, AFL-CIO. (Cadonau, Cary) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/17/2024) (cw). Modified on 1/17/2024 to correct counsel requesting Pro Hac Vice (ecp).
January 12, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9233815 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Regional District Council Training Trust, f/k/a Local 846 Training Trust, By and Through its Board of Trustees, Regional Local Union Nos. 846 and 847, International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers, AFL-CIO, Regional District, Council Retirement Plan and Employee Benefit Plans Trust, Regional District Council Welfare Plan and Trust, f/k/a Local 846 Rebar Welfare Trust, By and Through Its Board of Trustees, Regional District Council Vacation Trust Fund, f/k/a Local 846 Vacation Trust, By and Through Its Board of Trustees against Next Century Rebar, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Cadonau, Cary) (PDF of civil cover sheet replaced with flattened version on 1/16/2024) (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regional Local Union Nos. 846 and 847, International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers, AFL-CIO et al v. Next Century Rebar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regional District Council Welfare Plan and Trust
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regional District, Council Retirement Plan and Employee Benefit Plans Trust
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regional District Council Training Trust
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regional District Council Vacation Trust Fund
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regional Local Union Nos. 846 and 847, International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebar Retirement Plan And Trust
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Next Century Rebar, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D. Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?