Solterra Strata LLC et al v. Seabold Construction Co. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Solterra Strata LLC and Fargo Apartment LLC
Defendant: Seabold Construction Co. Inc., Kevin P. Owens and Hailey R. Owens
Case Number: 3:2024cv00151
Filed: January 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2024 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Fargo Apartment LLC. Filed by Fargo Apartment LLC. (Sherwood, Ashley)
March 21, 2024 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Solterra Strata LLC. Filed by Solterra Strata LLC. (Sherwood, Ashley)
March 14, 2024 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Seabold Construction Co. Inc.. (Gent, William)
March 12, 2024 Filing 13 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Gent, William)
March 12, 2024 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by All Defendants. (Gent, William)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER:Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, #10 , is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is now March 12, 2024. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut on 3/7/24. (jy)
March 7, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Documents. Filed by All Defendants. (Conable, Paul)
March 7, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Paul W. Conable, William T. Gent appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Conable, Paul)
February 15, 2024 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service upon Seabold Construction Co. Inc. served on 1/27/2024, answer due on 2/20/2024 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sherwood, Ashley)
February 15, 2024 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service upon Kevin P. Owens served on 1/27/2024, answer due on 2/20/2024 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sherwood, Ashley)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service upon Hailey R. Owens served on 1/27/2024, answer due on 2/20/2024 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sherwood, Ashley)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 by attorney Meghan Douris. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
February 1, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Meghan Douris. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9258664 #4 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
January 31, 2024 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Meghan Douris. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9258664. Filed by Fargo Apartment LLC, Solterra Strata LLC. (Douris, Meghan) Modified on 2/1/2024 to correct attorney requesting Pro Hac Vice admission. (dino)
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Hailey R. Owens, Kevin P. Owens, Seabold Construction Co. Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (gd)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/23/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/24/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 6/24/2024. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (gd)
January 23, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9245875 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Solterra Strata LLC, Fargo Apartment LLC against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Sherwood, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solterra Strata LLC et al v. Seabold Construction Co. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solterra Strata LLC
Represented By: Ashley J. Sherwood
Represented By: Meghan A. Douris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fargo Apartment LLC
Represented By: Ashley J. Sherwood
Represented By: Meghan A. Douris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seabold Construction Co. Inc.
Represented By: William T. Gent
Represented By: Paul W. Conable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin P. Owens
Represented By: William T. Gent
Represented By: Paul W. Conable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hailey R. Owens
Represented By: William T. Gent
Represented By: Paul W. Conable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?