Higgs v. Intel Corporation
Plaintiff: Ivan Higgs
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 3:2024cv00821
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Filing 7 First Notice of Appearance of Spencer D. Kelly appearing on behalf of Ivan Higgs. Filed by on behalf of Ivan Higgs. (Kelly, Spencer)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 . Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due by July 30, 2024. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 29, 2024 Filing 5 Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Wylie, Patrick)
May 21, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Wylie, Patrick)
May 21, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #1 Notice of Removal (Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The PDF was not flattened. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/17/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/17/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 10/17/2024. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (gd)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 24CV18189 from Washington County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9421307 issued.. Filed by Nicholas Beyer, Patrick Wylie, Spencer Kelly (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Wylie, Patrick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/21/2024) (cw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgs v. Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Patrick C. Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Higgs
Represented By: Spencer D. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?