Glas-Weld Systems, Inc. v. Boyle

Defendant: Michael P Boyle
Plaintiff: Glas-Weld Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2012cv02273
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Ann L. Aiken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2015 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Show Cause Why Default Judgment Should Not Be Entered 186 is DENIED in part, and defendants' Motion To Dismiss 210 is DENIED. The court does not order default judgment at this time. Rather, defend ants shall pay the attorney fees incurred by plaintiff in seeking to obtain the expert reports during the time period from April 6, 2015 through May 4, 2015; filing the motion for order to show cause 186 and supporting reply 202 ; the motion to co ntinue depositions 199 ; and the response in opposition to defendants' emergency motion to dismiss 214 . Plaintiff shall submit an affidavit of fees and supporting documentation within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order. See formal ORDER. Copy of ORDER sent to Pro Se Defendant. Signed on 7/30/2015 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh)
June 2, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 96 is stayed pending ruling on Motion for Claim Construction 95 ); Denying Motion to Sever 107 ; Denying Motion to Compel 108 ; Denying Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; Granting Motion 121 . Signed on 6/2/14 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ljb)
July 22, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting Motion to Amend 28 and granting in part plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order regarding depositions; Denying Motions to Dismiss 32 33 . Ordered and signed on 7/22/13 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glas-Weld Systems, Inc. v. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glas-Weld Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E Barton
Represented By: Paul A.C. Berg
Represented By: James A. Gale
Represented By: Gregory L. Hillyer
Represented By: Javier Sobrado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?