Mata v. Oregon Health Authority et al

Defendant: Bruce Goldberg, Bevin Hansell, Cathleen Kaufmann, Oregon Department of Human Services, Oregon Health Authority and Patricia Wentz
Plaintiff: Victorina Mata
Case Number: 6:2013cv00485
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Coffin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2016 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 111 . Therefore, Plaintiff's claim based on ORS 659A.199 is dismissed. Signed on 6/16/2016 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
November 17, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Partial Reconsideration 88 is deined. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
August 31, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Magistrate Judge Coffin's Findings and Recommendation 79 is Rejected. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 65 is Denied in Part and Granted in Part as follows: 1) DHS and Bevin Hansell are dismissed as defendants i n this action. 2) Plaintiff's state law claims for whistle blowing and retaliation pursuant to ORS §§ 659A.199, 659A.203, and 659A.230 against defendant OHA, and her 1st Amendment freedom of speech claims pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 against individual defendants Kaufman and Wentz remain viable, and this case shall be set for trial after a new Scheduling Order has been agreed to by the parties or set by the Court. Signed on 8/31/2015 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
August 6, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting Motion to Dismiss 29 ; Adopting Findings and Recommendation 32 . Plaintiff's due process claims are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Goldberg are dismissed without prejudice, with leave to amend the complaint to allege a section 1983 claim against Goldberg. Signed on 8/6/2014 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (plb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mata v. Oregon Health Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Goldberg
Represented By: Marc Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bevin Hansell
Represented By: Marc Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathleen Kaufmann
Represented By: Marc Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Human Services
Represented By: Marc Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Health Authority
Represented By: Marc Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Wentz
Represented By: Marc Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victorina Mata
Represented By: Larry L. Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?