Blancher v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Carole J. Blancher
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2014cv01860
Filed: November 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: John Jelderks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Granting Motion for Attorney Fees 21 . After considering Plaintiff's Motion, and counsel for Defendant having no objection, Plaintiff's Motion is hereby granted in the sum of $9463.00 in attorney fees, less the EAJA fees awarded of $5367.37, for a net of $4095.63 as full settlement of all claims for attorney fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b). See Order for further details. Signed on 7/5/2017 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 19 . Signed on 12/20/2016 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - No party having made objections, this Court follows the recommendation of the Advisory Committee and reviews Judge Jelderk's Findings and Recommendation for clear error on the face of the record. No such error is apparent. Accord ingly, the Court ADOPTS Judge Jelderk's Findings and Recommendation, ECF 15 , REVERSES the Commissioner of Social Security's decision, and REMANDS this action to the Social Security Administration for an award of benefits. Signed on 9/22/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blancher v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole J. Blancher
Represented By: Drew L. Johnson
Represented By: Kathryn Tassinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jordan D. Goddard
Represented By: Ronald K. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?