Mendoza et al v. Lithia Motors, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Angela Garrison, Donald Garrison, Angelita Jarman, David Jarman, Carol Jocks, Martin Jocks and Joseph Frank Mendoza
Defendant: Lithia Financial Corporation, Lithia Klamath, Inc., Lithia Motors, Inc. and Salem-V, LLC
Case Number: 6:2016cv01264
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Ann L. Aiken
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: Granting Motion for Summary Judgment 74 . See, formal Order and Opinion. Signed on 3/30/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rdr)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint 48 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to Amend is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifica lly, plaintiffs' claims under TILA, as well as claims under the UTPA based on violations of TILA, are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs' claims under O.R.S. § 646.608(1)(a), (b), (c), (j), and (s) are also dismissed with prejudice . However, plaintiffs' claim under O.R.S. § 646.608(1)(u) and OAR 137-020-0020(3)(u) are not dismissed, and plaintiffs have 30 days from this order to amend their complaint on this allegation. Signed on 3/27/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting in Part Denying in Part with leave to renew 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs' allegations defeat defendants' motion based on the statute of limitations at this stage of the proceeding s. However, plaintiffs' allegations regarding third-party products and services do not support claims under Or. Rev. Stat. §§ 646.608(l)(e),(g), and (k) and those claims are DISMISSED. Further, plaintiffs' theories of ascertainabl e loss and causation with respect to vehicle financing and third-party products and services are unclear and do not state a claim for violation of the UTPA. Within thirty (30) days, plaintiffs shall move to amend their complaint to clarify the nature of the losses they suffered and explain how their losses were caused by each defendant's conduct. See, formal Opinion. Signed on 1/11/2017 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza et al v. Lithia Motors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Garrison
Represented By: Jack E. McGehee
Represented By: Young W. Walgenkim
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Garrison
Represented By: Jack E. McGehee
Represented By: Young W. Walgenkim
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelita Jarman
Represented By: Jack E. McGehee
Represented By: Young W. Walgenkim
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jarman
Represented By: Jack E. McGehee
Represented By: Young W. Walgenkim
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Jocks
Represented By: Jack E. McGehee
Represented By: Young W. Walgenkim
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Jocks
Represented By: Jack E. McGehee
Represented By: Young W. Walgenkim
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Frank Mendoza
Represented By: Jack E. McGehee
Represented By: Young W. Walgenkim
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithia Financial Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithia Klamath, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithia Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem-V, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?