Rediger, et al v. Country Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Haystorm Harvesting & Fiber, Inc., Jared Rediger and Myranda Rediger
Defendant: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2016cv02263
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Ann L. Aiken
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 OPINION AND ORDER: Country Mutual's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment 93 is DENIED. Signed on 5/19/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant Country Mutual's Motion to Amend 63 is GRANTED. Signed on 12/13/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER and OPINION: Denying Motion to Dismiss 6 . See, formal Opinion. Signed on 4/14/2017 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rdr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rediger, et al v. Country Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kirsten L. Curtis
Represented By: Daniel E. Thenell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haystorm Harvesting & Fiber, Inc.
Represented By: R. Scott Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Rediger
Represented By: R. Scott Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myranda Rediger
Represented By: R. Scott Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?