Hooper v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Russell Hooper
Defendant: North Bend/Coos-Curry Housing Authority and United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Case Number: 6:2017cv00031
Filed: January 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael J. McShane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Defendants motion to dismiss 21 is GRANTED. Claims 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 are dismissed with prejudice. Claims 6, 8, and 9 are dismissed without prejudice. Claim 7 is dismissed with leave to file an amended complaint to cure deficiencies identified as to claim 7 only. Plaintiff has leave to file a First Amended Complaint on or before July 5, 2017. Signed on 5/31/2017 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Injunction 15 is denied. Signed on 4/4/2017 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 10 . Plaintiff has leave to file a first amended complaint on or before 4/1/2017. Signed on 3/1/2017 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Copy mailed to plaintiff) (cp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooper v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Russell Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Bend/Coos-Curry Housing Authority
Represented By: Jeffery J. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?