Adasa Inc. v. Avery Dennison Corporation
Plaintiff: Adasa Inc.
Defendant: Avery Dennison Corporation
Case Number: 6:2017cv01685
Filed: October 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Coffin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Opinion and Order signed on 12/15/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Plaintiff's Bill of Costs (ECF No. 350 ) is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees (ECF No. 351 ) pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 is GR ANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest (ECF No. 352 ) is GRANTED. The Court finds a pre-judgment interest rate of 9% simple interest appropriate. Post-judgment interest will be set pursuant to statute. Plaintiff' ;s Motion for Ongoing Royalties (ECF No. 353 ) is GRANTED. The Court finds an ongoing royalty rate of $.009 is appropriate. Defendant's renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or in the Alternative for a New Trial (ECF No. 362 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. 366 ) is GRANTED. The Court finds financial sanctions in the amount of $.0025 per tag is appropriate and applied to the number of for tags identified at trial and as stipulated by the parties. (jk)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Opinion and Order signed on 9/14/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Both parties' evidentiary objections are overruled. Defendant's Motion to File Sur-Reply (ECF No. 186 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's Alternative Motion f or Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. §§ 101 and 103 (ECF No. 169 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 168 ) is GRANTED except as to infringement of element F by the Commissioning Authority Schemas, which is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (ECF No. 169) is DENIED. (jk)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Opinion and Order signed on 4/30/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (ECF No. 122 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity (ECF No. 145 ) is GRANTED. (jk)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Opinion and Order. The claims in this action are construed as discussed in this Opinion and Order. Signed on 1/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adasa Inc. v. Avery Dennison Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adasa Inc.
Represented By: Johnathan E. Mansfield
Represented By: Glenn S. Orman
Represented By: Brett M. Pinkus
Represented By: Jonathan T. Suder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Dennison Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?