LowBeer v. Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony LowBeer
Defendant: Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01548
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Interstate Commerce
Cause of Action: 49:14706
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 Declaration of Nicole M. Nowlin . Filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #7 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Nowlin, Nicole)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc.. (Nowlin, Nicole)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 . Answer is due by 9/28/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 Declaration of Nicole M. Nowlin ISO Motion for Extension. Filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #4 .) (Nowlin, Nicole)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer /File Initial Appearance. Filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc.. (Nowlin, Nicole)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/21/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/22/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/22/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (kf)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc.. (Nowlin, Nicole)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV30089 from Lane County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5527225 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Nowlin, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LowBeer v. Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole M. Nowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony LowBeer
Represented By: Lawrence O. Gildea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?