Coleman v. Bay Area Health District et al

Plaintiff: Michael S Coleman and Michael S. Coleman
Defendant: Rebecca Davisson, Bay Area Hospital and Bay Area Health District
Case Number: 6:2018cv01787
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 10 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Rebecca Davisson waiver sent on 10/26/2018. Filed by Michael S. Coleman. (Collins, Loren)
November 30, 2018 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Bay Area Health District waiver sent on 10/26/2018. Filed by Michael S. Coleman. (Collins, Loren)
November 30, 2018 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Bay Area Hospital waiver sent on 10/26/2018. Filed by Michael S. Coleman. (Collins, Loren)
October 25, 2018 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bay Area Hospital, Rebecca Davisson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf)
October 25, 2018 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bay Area Health District. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf)
October 25, 2018 5 Amended Proposed Summons for Rebecca Davisson Filed by Michael S. Coleman. (Collins, Loren)
October 25, 2018 4 Amended Proposed Summons for Bay Area Hosptal Filed by Michael S. Coleman. (Collins, Loren)
October 25, 2018 3 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Michael S. Coleman. (Collins, Loren)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/7/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/11/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/11/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (kf)
October 9, 2018 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5586223 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Michael S Coleman against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Bay Area Health District, #3 Proposed Summons for Bay Area Hospital, #4 Proposed Summons for Rebecca Davisson). (Collins, Loren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Bay Area Health District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Davisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Health District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S Coleman
Represented By: Loren W. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Coleman
Represented By: Loren W. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?