Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Chukar River, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Bedrooms Bedrooms and Spiders, Golf Pro Music, MJ Publishing Trust, Combine Music Corp., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Painted Desert Music Corporation and House of Cash, Inc.
Defendant: Richard A. Whittemore, Chukar River, Inc. and Pamela Y. Whittemore
Case Number: 6:2018cv02041
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 Answer to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Pamela Y. Whittemore, Chukar River, Inc., Richard A. Whittemore. (Erwin, Lawrence)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service upon Chukar River, Inc. served on 11/28/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Podwill, Loren)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service upon Pamela Y. Whittemore served on 11/28/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Podwill, Loren)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service upon Richard A. Whittemore served on 11/28/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Podwill, Loren)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Chukar River, Inc.. (Erwin, Lawrence)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Lawrence W. Erwin appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Erwin, Lawrence)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Additional Copyright) (bd)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard A. Whittemore. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Pamela Y. Whittemore. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Chukar River, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/27/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/26/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 4/26/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Podwill, Loren)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5645087 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Included copyrights: PAu 997-329, PAu 681-700--Dirty Diana--Michael Jackson, RE 196-375, RE 196-286, Ep 100135, Eu 435121--I Walk the Line--John R. Cash, Ep 260746--Me And Bobby McGee--Kris Kristofferson; Fred Foster, RE 498-587 Ep 167400--Ring of Fire--June Carter; Merle Kilgore, PA 414-945--Punk Rock Girl--Dean Sabatino; Joseph Genaro; Rodney Linderman; David Schulthise. Filed by Combine Music Corp., Bedrooms Bedrooms and Spiders, Painted Desert Music Corporation, House of Cash, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Golf Pro Music against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Podwill, Loren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Chukar River, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Hill
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bedrooms Bedrooms and Spiders
Represented By: Alexander H. Hill
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golf Pro Music
Represented By: Alexander H. Hill
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJ Publishing Trust
Represented By: Alexander H. Hill
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combine Music Corp.
Represented By: Alexander H. Hill
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Alexander H. Hill
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painted Desert Music Corporation
Represented By: Alexander H. Hill
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Cash, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Hill
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Whittemore
Represented By: Lawrence W. Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chukar River, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence W. Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Y. Whittemore
Represented By: Lawrence W. Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?