Attune Foods, LLC v. CPM Wolverine Proctor, LLC
Plaintiff: Attune Foods, LLC
Defendant: CPM Wolverine Proctor, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv02213
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Property Damage - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by CPM Wolverine Proctor, LLC. (Turco, Caroline)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #16 . Answer is due by 3/1/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed Proposed Form of Order Submitted for Extension of Time to File First Responsivle Pleading. Filed by CPM Wolverine Proctor, LLC. (Turco, Caroline)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File First Responsive Pleading. Filed by CPM Wolverine Proctor, LLC. (Turco, Caroline)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #10 upon CPM Wolverine Proctor, LLC served on 1/9/2019 Filed by Attune Foods, LLC. (Gary, William)
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jacqueline K. Graves (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jkgraves. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (cp)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacqueline K. Graves for Attune Foods, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5683626 issued. Signed on 1/7/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Richard B. Walsh, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rbwalsh. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (cp)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard B. Walsh, Jr for Attune Foods, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5683623 issued. Signed on 1/7/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) Modified on 1/7/2019 to correct typo, resent NEF(cp).
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to CPM Wolverine Proctor, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacqueline K. Graves . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5683626. Filed by Attune Foods, LLC. (Gary, William)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard B. Walsh, Jr. . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5683623. Filed by Attune Foods, LLC. (Gary, William)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Attune Foods, LLC. (Gary, William)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/26/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/27/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/27/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 4 . Filed by Attune Foods, LLC. (Gary, William)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by Attune Foods, LLC in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 1/7/2019. (ljp)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 12/26/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Attune Foods, LLC. (Gary, William)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5681396 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Attune Foods, LLC against CPM Wolverine Proctor, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Gary, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Attune Foods, LLC v. CPM Wolverine Proctor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPM Wolverine Proctor, LLC
Represented By: Caroline Turco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attune Foods, LLC
Represented By: C. Robert Steringer
Represented By: William F. Gary
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Jacqueline K. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?