Benitoz v. Laney

Petitioner: Gerardo Luna Benitoz
Respondent: G. Laney
Case Number: 6:2018cv02217
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of G. Laney. Filed by G. Laney. (Larsen, Lynn)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Petitioners Motion for Appointment of Counsel #2 is DENIED without prejudice to his right to refile the Motion after Respondent has filed an answer or other responsive pleading. Answer is due by 4/15/2019. Signed on 2/13/19 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (Mailed copy of order to petitioner) (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition) (dsg)
February 8, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 82218 issued. (jn)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner shall submit a filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this order. Petitioner's failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (Mailed copy to petitioner) (dsg)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (Mailed copy to petitioner) (dsg)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Gerardo Luna Benitoz. (dsg)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Gerardo Luna Benitoz against G. Laney. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benitoz v. Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerardo Luna Benitoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G. Laney
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?