Morgan v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Carrie R. Morgan and Carrie Morgan
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv02227
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held. Discovery is to be completed by 5/29/2019. Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 6/28/2019. Dispositive Motions are due by 6/28/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due 30 days after dispositive motions are ruled on or by 7/29/2019 if no dispositive motions are filed. Brigid Turner (by telephone) present as counsel for plaintiff. Jessica Lancaster (by telephone) present as counsel for defendant. Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai presiding. (jk)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order: Rule 16 Conference is set for 1/29/2019 at 10:15AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The Court will initiate the call. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. Pursuant to this minute order the parties are relieved of their responsibility set forth in the Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, Section (c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Barhoum, John)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 4/29/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/27/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/27/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal. Filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barhoum, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Barhoum, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Declaration of Jessica M. Lancaster in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Errata Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service) (Barhoum, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barhoum, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV55140 from Deschutes County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5682852 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Original Complaint). (Barhoum, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie R. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Morgan
Represented By: Brigid K. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jessica Lewicki Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?