Middleton v. Laney

Petitioner: Kenneth Eugene Middleton, Jr.
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Case Number: 6:2019cv00027
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Thomas J. Hester is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Kenneth Eugene Middleton, Jr. (Hester, Thomas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Samuel A. Kubernick is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Garrett Laney. (Kubernick, Samuel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Garrett Laney. Filed by Garrett Laney. (Larsen, Lynn)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 and Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 are GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main St., Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent petitioner in this proceeding. Answer is due by 4/1/2019. Signed on 1/31/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition) (Mailed order to petitioner) (Sent order and petition to FPD via interoffice mail.) (dsg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Case Assignment Notice #5 sent to Kenneth Eugene Middleton returned as undeliverable. (dsg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed copy to petitioner) (dsg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration of Kenneth Eugene Middleton. Filed by Kenneth Eugene Middleton, Jr. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel #3 .) (dsg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Kenneth Eugene Middleton, Jr. (dsg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Kenneth Eugene Middleton, Jr against Garrett Laney. (dsg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Kenneth Eugene Middleton, Jr. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middleton v. Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Eugene Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Thomas J. Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Samuel A. Kubernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?